ROBERTS v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-vv-00452-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo WILMA ROBERTS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Simon Lipsetts +1 410 263 5702
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/31/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/15/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $17,000.00. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Petitioner's Election
    PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 10/23/96 Election(y/n): y (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
      Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition, and awarding petitioner attorneys' fees and costs in the sum of $17,000.00 payable jointly to petitioner, Wilma Roberts and to petitioner's attorney of record, Eric S. Lippsetts, Esq. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Notice Not to Seek Review
            JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW by WILMA ROBERTS and HHS. Service: 10/9/96. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996 DECISION of Special Master
              Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Stipulation
                Stipulation of fact. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Order
                  ORDER set Brief [stipulation] deadline to 9/16/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Order
                    ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time within which respond to motion to dismiss and Response to [28-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 7/22/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996, Terminated: 5/23/1996 Terminated:
                      MOTION by WILMA ROBERTS (Service : 5/20/96 ) to Extend Time within which respond to motion to dismiss , (until July 20, 1996). Response due: 6/6/96 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 Order
                        ORDER Response to [28-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 5/20/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by HHS (Service : 4/4/96 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 5/6/96. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996 Order
                            ORDER set Status Conference for 11:30 a.m. on 4/4/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Order
                              ORDER reset Motion Filing deadline to 3/25/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Order
                                ORDER set Motion Filing deadline to 1/29/96 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 12/8/95 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Order
                                    ORDER entered directing respondent to file a Status Report by deadline of 10/6/95 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/21/1995 notice of filing
                                      Notice of filing (Exhibit 1: Medical Opinion), by WILMA ROBERTS. Service: 9/18/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Order
                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 9/21/95 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Additional Documentation
                                          Additional Documentation [medical records and Physician's opinion] by WILMA ROBERTS. Service: 8/17/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 Additional Documentation
                                            Additional Documentation (medical records in two (2) volumes) by WILMA ROBERTS. Service: 7/31/95 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995, Terminated: 7/25/1995 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                              MOTION by WILMA ROBERTS (Service: 7/17/95 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney WILMA ROBERTS for WILMA ROBERTS Added Eric Simon Lipsetts . Response due: 8/17/95. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Order
                                                ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file records requested by the special master set Additional Documents due: 7/31/95 for WILMA ROBERTS ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995, Terminated: 7/24/1995 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by WILMA ROBERTS (Service : 7/17/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file records requested by the special master , (until July 31, 1995). (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/7/1995 Order
                                                    ORDER entered directing petitioner shall supplement completely the record, including, but not limit to, records from Peter Bernad, M.D. and John M. Smothers, Ph.D. (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Order
                                                      ORDER entered scheduling a Status Conference for 1:00 p.m. on 6/1/95 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 Respondent's Report
                                                        RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 5/11/95 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Order
                                                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to file a Rule 4 report set date Respondent's Report due to 5/12/95 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995, Terminated: 4/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by HHS (Service: 4/26/95) to Extend Time to file a Rule 4 report [15 days]. Response due: 5/15/95 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Michael Patrick Milmoe. Service: 4/26/95 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Additional Documentation
                                                                Additional Documentation [reply to Respoindent's response to Petitioner's supplemental filing] by WILMA ROBERTS. Service: (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/18/1995 Order
                                                                  SEE 90-3470V FOR ORDER assigning this case to Special Master John F. Edwards and scheduling respondent's report for 4/26/95 Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/1/1994, Entered: 12/2/1994 Preliminary Review
                                                                    RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RULE 4). Service: 12/1/94 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994 Description not available
                                                                      Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Review Records. Service: 10/31/94 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Description not available
                                                                        RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 8/31/94 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 Order
                                                                          ORDER granting [3-1] motion for Boyd McDowell to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Boyd McDowell for WILMA ROBERTS petitioner appears pro se ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994, Terminated: 6/3/1994 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by WILMA ROBERTS (Service : 5/16/94 ) for Boyd McDowell to Withdraw as Attorney Response due: 6/16/94 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/1994, Entered: 5/5/1994 Order for Preliminary Review
                                                                              ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/5/1994 Petition
                                                                                PETITION by WILMA ROBERTS FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 01/01/01 (No Shot Date Provided). (FE) Modified on 05/05/1994
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/5/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                  CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE) Modified on 05/05/1994
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/5/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE) Modified on 05/05/1994
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?