DUCAY, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-vv-00531-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo RICHARD DUCAY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherry Kay Drew +1 847 729 4320 mcdowelldrew@att.net
No Logo ROBERT DUCAY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherry Kay Drew +1 847 729 4320 mcdowelldrew@att.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerard William Fischer +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 1/31/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/30/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $4,345.10 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner attorneys' fees and costs in the sum of $4,345.10, with payment to be made by check made payable jointly to counsel of record and petitioner (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Gerard William Fischer. Service : 6/21/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Notice Not to Seek Review
          JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW by RICHARD DUCAY, ROBERT DUCAY, HHS. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
            Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz re: attorneys' fees. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Petitioner's Election
              PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 12/6/94 Election(y/n): y (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 11/30/1994
                JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a)(1) dismissing the petition (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 Terminated Case
                  Case closed. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/30/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by RICHARD DUCAY, et al (Service: 11/17/94) to Dismiss filed. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/25/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by RICHARD DUCAY, ROBERT DUCAY (Service : 11/17/94 ) for Attorney Fees Response due: 12/19/94 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/25/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by RICHARD DUCAY, ROBERT DUCAY (Service : 11/17/94 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William Scott Evans for ROBERT DUCAY, attorney William Scott Evans for RICHARD DUCAY Added Sherry Kay Drew. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994 Description not available
                          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 9/19/94 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994
                            See 91-0497V for ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Petition
                              PETITION by RICHARD DUCAY, ROBERT DUCAY FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 6/13/36 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?