SUTTON, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-vv-00533-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JULIE SUTTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Marvin Barnett +1 713 439 0561
No Logo W. THOMAS SUTTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Marvin Barnett +1 713 439 0561
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 1/31/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/10/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition for failure to substantiate and to prosecute this case (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 DECISION of Special Master
      Decision [dismissal order] of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing petition for failure to substantiate and to prosecute this case. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Order to Show Cause
        See 91-500 V for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. Petitioner's Resp. to Cause Order due: 4/3/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994 Description not available
          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 9/19/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994
            See 91-0497V for ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Petition
              PETITION by W. THOMAS SUTTON, JULIE SUTTON FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 1/1/74 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 5/17/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?