HUSEN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00409-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ROBERT von HUSEN, Plaintiff

Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Beth Donis
Office COFC
Filed 6/18/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $40000
Nature of Suit 312 - Civilian Pay - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/6/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Description not available
G.A.O. Certificate of Settlement Number: Z-2939339 Dated: May 25, 1995 Amount: $34,000 Paid by Treasury Dept.: 6/2/95 (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Certified Transcript to Attorney
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered purusant to Rule 68 awarding plaintiff the sum of $34,000.00, inclusive of interest, costs, expenses, and attorney fees. Plaintiff further releases any claim to severance pay resulting from the termination of his employment with the National Transportation Safety Board (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Terminated:
          Stipulation by ROBERT von HUSEN, USA for entry of judgment. Service to defendant's counsel: 3/2/95 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Terminated:
            STATUS REPORT by ROBERT von HUSEN on behalf of both parties. Service: 1/24/95 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
              ORDER entered directing the filing of a status report . Set Status Report deadline to 1/24/95 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated:
                STATUS REPORT by ROBERT von HUSEN Service: 11/2/94 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [16-1] motion to file status report out of time ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994, Terminated: 11/2/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ROBERT von HUSEN (Service : 10/27/94 ) to file status report out of time Response due: 11/14/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Terminated:
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/29/94 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Terminated:
                        Deadline updated [30 days] Defendant's Status Report deadline to 9/28/94 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/28/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                          ORDER entered enlarging the next Status Report due by 8/29/94 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994 Terminated:
                            STATUS REPORT by ROBERT von HUSEN. Service: 6/9/94. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Terminated:
                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/18/94. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Terminated:
                                Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 6/17/94 . (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated:
                                  STATUS REPORT by ROBERT von HUSEN (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File status report out of time. Plaintiff's status report file this day (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/21/1994, Entered: 4/28/1994, Terminated: 4/26/1994 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by ROBERT von HUSEN (Service : 4/21/94 ) for Leave to File status report out of time (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994 Terminated:
                                        STATUS REPORT by ROBERT von HUSEN Service: 3/9/94 (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994 Terminated:
                                          Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 4/8/94 (DS) Modified on 04/25/1994
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending further order; and directing the filing of a status report(s) on March 9, 1994, and every thirty days thereafter set Status Report deadline to 3/9/94 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: 2/3/1994, Terminated: 2/7/1994 Motion to Stay
                                              MOTION by ROBERT von HUSEN (Service: 2/2/94) to Stay Proceedings (to allow settlement discussions). (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/25/1994, Terminated: 2/7/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                MOTION by ROBERT von HUSEN (Service : 1/18/94 ) to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions , (until February 4, 1994) filed by leave of the Judge. Copies to parties. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting the plaintiff's motion for extension of time, (until February 4, 1994) to file pretrial submissions which shall be filed by leave of the court ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/25/1994 Terminated:
                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/4/94 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      ORDER entered denying the parties cross-motions for summary judgment and the proccedings reinstated under the 8/19/92 pretrial order with plaintiff's initial submission to be furnished by 1/21/94 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/1992, Entered: 1/12/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        JUDGE'S PRETRIAL ORDER (Rule 16) filed (signed by Judge James F. Merow). (Plaintiff's submission: 10/5/92 - 45 days of receipt - 30 days of receipt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/18/1992, Entered: 1/12/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/18/1992, Entered: 1/12/1994 Terminated:
                                                            COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 030860 (FE)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?