CARTER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00525-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LOUIS CARTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Kevin Griffin
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR. +1 850 434 3541 +4357 435 435 7899 cbeall@mhw-law.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 4/15/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) of the CAFC dated April 7, 1994 , affirming the Court of Federal Claims decision re , [8-1] appeal by LOUIS CARTER (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by LOUIS CARTER. Copy to USA, Judge to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 034635. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [8-1] appeal by LOUIS CARTER CAFC NUMBER: 93-5168. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file an appeal and reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/13/93 . (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994, Terminated: 6/11/1993 Terminated:
          MOTION by LOUIS CARTER (Service : 6/9/93 ) to Extend Time to file an appeal, (60 days). Response due: 7/12/93 (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated Case
              Case closed. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 4/14/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER entered directing the dismissal of complaint. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1992, Entered: 1/14/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Charles Franklin Beall Jr. Service : 8/24/92 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 1/13/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                    Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/1992, Entered: 1/13/1994 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. RECEIPT # 31376. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 154 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?