RUTT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00760-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DONALD R. RUTT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Joseph Nolan +1 303 734 0262 +7340 734 734 0264
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Rollins Davis
Office COFC
Filed 11/2/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 11/22/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 18, 1993 . Notice to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 12/1/1993 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 12/1/1993 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: 12/1/1993 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
        UNPUBLISHED DECISION entered granting defendant's motion to Dismiss and directing entry of judgment (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via Fed. Ex. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; Transcript deadline set for 12/17/93 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Oral Argument
            Oral Argument held re: defendant's motion to dismiss. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 12/1/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 12/1/1993 Complaint
                COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. RECEIPT # 032374. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 88 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?