RICE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00784-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GREGORY T. RICE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck Richard Pardue +1 706 823 2000 +1 706 722 0149 chuckpardue@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/12/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/5/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated April 6, 1995 affirming U.S. Court of Federal Claims decision re: [10-1] appeal by GREGORY T. RICE. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/1994, Entered: 6/27/1994
    CAFC Case Number Re: [10-1] appeal by GREGORY T. RICE. CAFC NUMBER: 94-5128. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/20/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by GREGORY T. RICE. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 036901. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: 5/5/1994, Terminated: 5/5/1994 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. Each party shall bear its own costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: 5/5/1994
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994, Terminated: 5/5/1994 Published DecisionCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED DECISION granting [6-1] motion to Dismiss, the plaintiff's Cross-Motion for summary Judgment is denied, and the plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed. Each party is to bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties with plaintiff served by Federal Express. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994 Terminated:
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service : 4/7/94 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 12/2/1993 Terminated:
                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 16, 1993 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/17/1993 Terminated:
                  Deadline updated; Transcript deadline set for 11/22/93 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/17/1993 Terminated:
                    Oral Argument held re: cross motion for summary judgment. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/17/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                      ORDER entered scheduling Oral Argument (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/1993, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        REPLY by GREGORY T. RICE to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/18/93. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/12/1993, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/12/93 ) to Dismiss , or for for Summary Judgment . Response due: 4/12/93. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/1992, Entered: 11/17/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/12/1992, Entered: 11/17/1993 Terminated:
                              COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 32467 Answer due on 1/11/93 (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?