HASENEI v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00824-WCR
District Judge Wilkes C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GORDON J. HASENEI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Scott Little +1 410 539 3545 +1 410 547 8313 starkandlittle@comcast.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Abelson +1 202 616 0461 +1 202 514 7969 steven.abelson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/2/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $20000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 4/7/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/11/1994 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GORDON J. HASENEI. Service: 4/5/94. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/11/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 5/2/94 for USA . ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994, Terminated: 3/4/1994 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until May 2, 1994). Response due: 3/18/94. (HW) Modified on 03/04/1994
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/5/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER entered that the proceedings in this case are no longer stayed and resetting Answer deadline to 3/7/94 for USA ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ). Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/1994, Entered: 1/5/1994 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by GORDON J. HASENEI Service: 12/30/93 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 9/22/1993, Entered: 12/22/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [3-1] motion for Leave to File status report with parties to file a Joint Status Report by 1/3/94 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 12/22/1993, Terminated: 9/22/1993 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/15/93 ) for Leave to File status report . Response due: 10/18/93 (FE) Modified on 12/22/1993
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/1992, Entered: 12/22/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson . Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 12/22/1993
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/1992, Entered: 12/22/1993 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 32673 (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?