BUNNER, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-vv-00808-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo AMELIA L. BUNNER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Roy Teddy
No Logo HENCY E. BUNNER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Roy Teddy
No Logo NANCY CHRISTINE BUNNER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Roy Teddy
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia A. Kozak Putnam +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 1/31/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/8/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 5/27/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $7,630.20. See letter in file. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 5/4/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994 Petitioner's Election
    PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 4/26/94 (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/18/1994 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
      Certified copy of judgment on attorney fees forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioners attorney's fees in the amount of $6,230.00, and costs in the sum of $1,400.20 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/15/1994 DECISION of Special Master
          Decision of Special Master Laura D. Millman entered awarding attorneys' fees. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a)(2) dismissing the petition with prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Terminated Case
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994 Stipulation
                Stipulation by AMELIA L. BUNNER, et al. and HHS [for attorney fees and costs] entered. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Stipulation
                  Stipulation by AMELIA L. BUNNER, et al. and HHS of voluntary dismissal with prejudice entered. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/1993, Entered: 3/3/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 3/3/1994 Petition
                      PETITION by AMELIA L. BUNNER, HENCY E. BUNNER, NANCY CHRISTINE BUNNER. FILING FEE $ 120. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 3/10/1994 Vaccination Date
                        Vac. Date: 4/15/60. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1991, Entered: 3/3/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 113 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?