LEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00434-WCR
District Judge Wilkes C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES A. LEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Eleanor Baluss +1 202 739 3731 +1 202 739 3001
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/12/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/9/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [6-1] motion to Dismiss and granting [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated:
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 19, 1994 . Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/27/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental authority (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 Terminated:
            Oral Argument held re: [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA (Transcript due 11/18/94). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994, Terminated: 10/20/1994 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/13/94) for Leave to File supplemental authority . (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 10/19/94 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated:
                  REPLY by JAMES A. LEE to response to [12-1] cross-motion . Service: 2/1/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment, etc., granting [12-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/24/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by JAMES A. LEE (Service : 1/14/94 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment by USA (to February 1, 1994). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/21/1994, Terminated: 1/24/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by JAMES A. LEE (Service : 1/14/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment, etc. (to February 1, 1994). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by USA to [12-1] cross motion. Service: 1/3/94 Reply due: 1/20/94 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/1994, Entered: 1/4/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/20/1993, Entered: 12/21/1993, Terminated: 1/3/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/17/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to January 4, 1994). Response due: 1/3/94 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by JAMES A. LEE by leave of Judge. Service: 11/19/93 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Terminated:
                                  CROSS MOTION by JAMES A. LEE ( Service: 11/19/93 ) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA Response due: 11/15/93 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Terminated:
                                    Deadline updated; Response to [12-1] cross motion reset to 12/20/93 . (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment; Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/19/93, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 11/19/93 . ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/1/1993, Entered: 11/5/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by JAMES A. LEE (Service : 11/1/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment (to November 19, 1993). Response due: 11/18/93 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Terminated:
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 10/14/93 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Terminated:
                                            Regulatory Addendum filed by USA. Service: 10/14/93. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Terminated:
                                              Administrative record (comprised of one bound volume) filed by USA. Service: 10/14/93 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/93 ) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/15/93 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 9/20/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint, reset Answer deadline to 10/14/93 for USA ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993, Terminated: 9/16/1993 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/10/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint, (until October 14, 1993). Response due: 9/27/93. (HW) Modified on 09/20/1993
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993 Terminated:
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service : 7/16/93 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993 Terminated:
                                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 34500. [Answer due on 9/10/93] (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?