ALONGE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00450-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOHN L. ALONGE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Dunlavey
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Patrick Murphy +1 202 362 0840
Office COFC
Filed 7/21/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/11/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) affirming the U.S. Court of Federal Claims decision re: [17-1] appeal by JOHN L. ALONGE. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 5/24/1994
    CAFC Case Number Re: [17-1] appeal by JOHN L. ALONGE. CAFC NUMBER: 94-5112. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 5/4/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOHN L. ALONGE. Copy to defendant, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 36692. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/1994, Entered: 4/5/1994 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [13-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-1] order Dismissing Complaint ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ). Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 4/1/1994, Entered: 4/2/1994 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE by USA to [13-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-1] order Dismissing Complaint. Service: 4/1/94 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER directing defendant to file Response to [13-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-1] order Dismissing Complaint on 4/1/94 . ( by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/22/1994, Terminated: 4/4/1994 Terminated:
              MOTION by JOHN L. ALONGE (Service : 3/16/94 ) for Reconsideration of [11-1] order Dismissing Complaint (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994
                JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994
                  Case closed. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 Court Filing
                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss, and Dismissing Complaint . ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via Fed. Ex. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 12/2/93 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/17/1993, Entered: 11/18/1993 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by JOHN L. ALONGE to [8-1] motion to Dismiss Service: 11/15/93. Reply due: 12/2/93 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/8/93 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 11/8/93. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Administrative Record
                            Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 10/8/93. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting the 9/17/93 motion for enlargement, directing the filing of the administrative record ASAP and waiving the filing of copies of same. ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time, to respond to complaint, reset Answer deadline to 10/8/93 for USA ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993, Terminated: 9/17/1993 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/93 ) to Extend Time, to respond to complaint, (until October 8, 1993). Response due: 10/4/93. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: 8/25/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Patrick Murphy. Service : 7/29/93 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/1993, Entered: 8/25/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Christine C. Nettesheim . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/1993, Entered: 8/25/1993 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 34598. [Answer due on 9/20/93] (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?