BROWN BEAR BAITS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00509-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BROWN BEAR BAITS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Lennox Wilson +1 703 620 1904
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert N. Dorosin
Office COFC
Filed 8/13/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/21/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; checks forwarded to counsel for plaintiff, principal of $9,046.13, and interest of $5,089.61, totalling $14,135.74. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Description not available
    G.A.O. Certificate of Settlement Number: Z2937541 Dated: 2/15/95 Amount: 818.95 Paid by Treasury Dept.: 2/23/95 (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/19/1994 Costs TaxedCourt Filing
      Taxation of Costs for BROWN BEAR BAITS in the amount of $818.95 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties and to Judge. Cost Fees or Expenses (c/f/e) C C/F/E for PLA C/F/E Amount 819 (HW)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/19/1994 Set/Clear Flags
        **Removed Bill of Costs Flag (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 9/8/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994 Terminated:
          REPLY by BROWN BEAR BAITS to [27-1] objection bill of costs by USA. Service:9/6/94 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 9/1/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994 Terminated:
            OBJECTION ( Reply due 9/16/94 ) by USA to [26-1] bill of costs by BROWN BEAR BAITS. Service: 9/1/94. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 8/19/1994, Entered: 8/22/1994 Terminated:
              Bill of costs by BROWN BEAR BAITS Service: 8/18/94 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 9/6/94 ) (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 7/25/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994 Terminated:
                  JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 awarding plaintiff the sum of $9,046.13 plus statutory interest. Costs to plaintiff (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Deadline updated entered setting Motion Filing deadline to 8/22/94 for costs . (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994 Terminated Case
                      Case closed. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        ORDER directing Clerk to enter judgment for Plaintiff in the amount of $9,046.13 plus statutory interest. Cost to Plaintiff (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/14/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Terminated:
                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 13, 1994; together with joint exhibits 100A-G, 101A-G, 102A-G, 103-111; and defendant's exhibits 1-6. Notice to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/7/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                            PUBLISHED DECISION entered directing the Clerk to enter Judgment for plaintiff by 7/12/94 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Costs to plaintiff. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1994, Entered: 4/1/1996 Trial Brief
                              (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994 Terminated:
                                Trial held (Transcipt due 7/13/94). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994 Terminated:
                                  JOINT MOTION for Leave to File Appendix G materials out of time . (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    Witness list by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 6/9/94 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      Pretrial brief by USA filed by leave of Judge. Service: 6/9/94 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated:
                                        Exhibit list by USA FILED BY LEAVE OF JUDGE. Service: 6/9/94 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated:
                                          Exhibit list by BROWN BEAR BAITS and USA FILED BY LEAVE OF JUDGE. (FE) Modified on 06/13/1994
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated:
                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by BROWN BEAR BAITS FILED BY LEAVE OF JUDGE. Service: 6/9/94 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated:
                                              Witness list by BROWN BEAR BAITS FILED BY LEAVE OF JUDGE. Service: 6/9/94 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Terminated:
                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by BROWN BEAR BAITS and USA FILED BY LEAVE OF JUDGE. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  ORDER entered scheduling a Trial for 10:00 a.m. on 6/13/94 ; Discovery closes on 5/2/94 , and scheduling a Pretrial Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 6/1/94 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/29/1994, Entered: 3/31/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                    ORDER entered re: trial being held in June (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      ORDER entered re further proceedings ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/6/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff for 5/2/94; Dispositive Motion Filing deadline on 3/15/94 ; Status Report [i.e. notification if this case can be resolved by dispositive motion] due on 2/15/94. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: 12/2/1993 Terminated:
                                                          NOTICE of change of address by attorney for BROWN BEAR BAITS. Service: 11/26/93 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 12/2/1993 Terminated:
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 Terminated:
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/10/93 (JPSR due 12/28/93). (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ; setting Answer deadline to 11/10/93 for USA ; and setting date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 11/30/93 . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 10/15/1993
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Terminated:
                                                                  Deadline updated; setting date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 11/30/93 . (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993, Terminated: 10/14/1993 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/8/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until November 22, 1993). Response due: 10/26/93. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 8/19/1993 Terminated:
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert N. Dorosin Service : 8/18/93 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/16/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/16/1993 Terminated:
                                                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 34758. [Answer due on 10/12/93.] (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?