SKEPPLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00537-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROMEO F. SKEPPLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Chapin Maizel +1 213 894 2434 +1 213 894 2380
Office COFC
Filed 8/27/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 2/28/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated April 17, 1995 affirming the United States Court of Federal Claims decision re [26-1] appeal by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [26-1] appeal by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE CAFC NUMBER: 94-5106. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE. Copy to defendant, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 036586. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 3/22/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER enterd returning plaintiff's motion to supplement the administrative record, counter-statement of facts and cross-motion for summary judgment as moot (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
          UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [23-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [22-1] judgment order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE (Service : 3/5/94 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [22-1] judgment order . Response due: 3/21/94 . (HW)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/3/1994
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 3/3/1994 Judgment*
                JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, granting [14-2] motion for Summary Judgment, and directing dismissal of the complaint. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties, with plaintiff served via Fed. Ex. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/23/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE (Service : 2/11/94 ) for Leave to File for an enlargement of time within which to file its reply to USA's answer to complaint , (until March 18, 1994). Response due: 2/28/94. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/17/1993, Entered: 12/20/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/1993, Entered: 12/17/1993, Terminated: 12/17/1993 Terminated:
                        MOTION by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE, USA for Protective Order (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993 Administrative Record
                          Administrative record, consisting of two bound volumes, filed by USA. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/14/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record, granting [13-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 12/15/1993 Statement of Facts
                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 12/13/93 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 12/15/1993 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/13/93) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , and in the alternative, for Summary Judgment . Response due: 1/13/94 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 12/15/1993, Terminated: 12/14/1993 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/13/93) for Leave to File administrative record ; and for for Waiver of Duplication Response due: 12/30/93 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents, granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/13/93 for USA (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of change of address by ROMEO F. SKEPPLE. Service: 11/26/93 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993, Terminated: 12/2/1993 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 11/23/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents (to December 13, 1993). Response due: 12/10/93 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/23/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to December 13, 1993). Response due: 12/10/93 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/10/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 11/29/93 for USA . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: 10/29/1993, Terminated: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to November 29, 1993). Response due: 11/15/93 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/27/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER directing USA to deliver Administrative Record to court immediately, or advise the court of date when Record will be delivered . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 9/20/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Donna Chapin Maizel Service : 9/16/93. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/1993, Entered: 8/31/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER entered directing defendant to deliver the Administrative Record to the court as soon as possible. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/27/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993 Court Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges filed. Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/27/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993
                                                        COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #34851. Answer due on 10/26/93. (AB)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 411 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?