BAIRD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00564-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELDRED BAIRD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Anthony Maksym +1 313 961 1885
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Jay Lerman +1 202 307 0282
Office COFC
Filed 9/9/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/24/1994
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 8/24/1994, Entered: 8/26/1994 Terminated:
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/24/1994, Entered: 8/26/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/22/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
      ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing complaint (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated:
        REPLY by USA to response to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 6/10/94 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994, Terminated: 6/20/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/10/94) to Extend Time to file reply brief [to June 10, 1994] out of time. Response due: 6/27/94 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 5/12/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by ELDRED BAIRD filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/11/94. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 5/12/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                RESPONSE by ELDRED BAIRD to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/11/94. Reply due: 5/31/94. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/2/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994, Terminated: 8/24/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER directing the Clerk to return unfiled, plaintiff's statement of genuine issues; response to motion for summary judgment and affidavit of Dr. Ronald Mako. Items are returned to plaintiff for correction of defects : 1) Proof of service is not attached to each document or copy; 2) Documents do not comply with the provisions of Rule 7(b) re: brief, supporting memorandum, affidavits shall be attached to motion; and 3) Affidavit is not listed in table of contents. After corrections are made, documents may be filed by my leave, if they are out of time, with defendant's time to respond to run from the adte of re-service (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/28/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment Response to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 4/25/94 ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/22/1994, Terminated: 3/28/1994 Terminated:
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION by ELDRED BAIRD (Service: 3/16/94) to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment (to April 24, 1994). Response due: 4/5/93 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994 Terminated:
                        Administrative record (two volumes) filed by USA Service: 3/3/94. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994, Terminated: 8/16/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/3/94 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 3/21/94. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994 Terminated:
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 3/3/94. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/17/94 ) for Leave to File to file the administrative record and for waiver of copying requirements . (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/17/94 ) to Extend Time within which to file answer to complaint , (until March 3, 1994). Response due: 10/7/93. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/21/1994, Entered: 1/26/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and resetting Answer deadline to 2/17/94 for USA . ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/24/1994 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/14/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to February 17, 1994). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/21/1994, Terminated: 1/21/1994 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/14/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to February 17, 1994). (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/6/1993 Terminated:
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman Service : 12/3/93 (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/29/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          ORDER entered re enlargements of time and parties to file requests for oral argument as separate item. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993
                                            **Not member of bar flag removed. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993 Terminated:
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by ELDRED BAIRD. Copies (5) to defendant. (Answer due 1/18/94). (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/12/1993, Entered: 10/12/1993, Terminated: 8/24/1994 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered directing counsel for BAIRD to show cause within 15 days why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or otherwise comply with the rules of the Court. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Robert J. Yock ) (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993 Terminated:
                                                    Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, Southern Division, case number 93-CV-71856-DT, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Attorney: Jon R. Garrett ) ( Amended complaint due by 10/7/93 ) (AB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Unassigned . (AB)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993 Set/Clear Flags
                                                        **Not member of bar flag set (AB)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?