LONGVAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00569-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY LONGVAL, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Peter Jacobus +1 907 277 3333 +1 907 264 6666 kpjlaw@yahoo.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/10/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/6/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998
JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] defendant's motion for summary judgment (under RCFC 12(b)) on all outstanding issues. The challenge of the ABCMR decision is denied, and plaitiff's claim must be dismissed. ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith.) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 49 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
        RESPONSE by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 9/16/96 ) to [48-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental authority [filed by leave of the Judge]. Reply due: 9/30/96 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 48 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/5/96) for Leave to File supplemental authority . Response due: 8/22/96 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 47 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 Transcript
            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 5, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/13/1996 Oral Argument
              Oral Argument re: [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 4/4/96 ) (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER entered scheduling oral argument for 2:00 p.m., 3/5/96 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Kenneth Peter Jacobus (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. to [36-1] motion response by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. filed by leave of the judge. Service: 6/30/95 (FE) Modified on 07/19/1995
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered allowing plaintiff's response to the information set forth in Mr. Taylor's affidavit shall be filed by leave notwithstanding the failure to comply with the following rules of this court: RCFCs 81(d)(1), 83, and 82(c) (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to information set forth in affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor, reset Brief deadline to 7/5/95 and filing Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time by leave of Judge (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995, Terminated: 6/26/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 6/19/95) to Extend Time to respond to information set forth in affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor by leave of Judge. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's reply [i.e. affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor] set Brief deadline for the reply to 6/20/95 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995, Terminated: 6/9/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 6/2/95) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's reply [i.e. affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor] [to June 20, 1995]. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER entered granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the information set forth in the affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor, granting [34-1] motion for Leave to File notes SEAL; plaintiff's Response to the information set forth in Mr. Taylor's affidavit by 6/5/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995, Terminated: 6/1/1995 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service : 5/19/95 ) to Extend Time to respond to the information set forth in the affidavit of Vaughn E. Taylor filed by leave of the judge. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 Terminated:
                                    NONOPPOSITION RESPONSE by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 5/19/95) to [34-1] motion for Leave to File notes UNDER SEAL filed by leave of the judge. (FE) Modified on 06/06/1995
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 4/18/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/95) for Leave to File notes UNDER SEAL Response due: 5/4/95 (FE) Modified on 04/20/1995
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 33 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to its motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/18/95 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995, Terminated: 3/10/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/95) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to its motion to dismiss [to April 18, 1995]. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/22/95 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995, Terminated: 3/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/17/95) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss [to March 23, 1995]. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/21/95 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/13/1995, Terminated: 1/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/12/95) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss [to February 21, 1995]. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/1/1994 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth P. Jacobus by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. Re: [23-2] order by leave of Judge. Service 11/14/94 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/1/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/19/95 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss and filing Plaintiff's original affidavit of Kenneth P. Jacobus, etc. by leave of Judge (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994, Terminated: 11/30/1994 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/94 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss (to January 19, 1995) (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            RESPONSE by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 9/15/94) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss by leave of Judge. Reply due: 9/29/94. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER filing Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to dimiss by leave of Judge and directing Plaintiff to comply with Rule 83 and to strictly comply with all applicable deadlines of Court (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Order
                                                                ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss, granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss and Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 9/16/94 (signed by Chief Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994, Terminated: 9/13/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                  MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 9/5/94) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to September 16, 1994] by leave of Judge. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 9/8/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                    MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 8/22/94) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [to September 6, 1994] by leave of Judge. Response due: 9/8/94 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss and Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 8/22/94 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994, Terminated: 8/12/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                        MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 7/22/94) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [to August 22, 1994] filed by leave of Judge. (FE) Modified on 08/17/1994
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 7/22/94 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/23/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994, Terminated: 6/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service : 5/17/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss until July 22, 1994. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 5/23/94 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/22/1994, Entered: 4/28/1994, Terminated: 5/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service: 4/21/94) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to May 23, 1994]. Response due: 5/23/94. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/16/1994, Entered: 2/22/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/22/94 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/15/1994, Terminated: 2/16/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (Service : 2/8/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to April 22, 1994). (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                                      Court-martial Trial Record, consisting of seven bound volumes, filed. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File the record of trial. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/28/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994, Terminated: 2/4/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/28/94 ) for Leave to File the record of trial . (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/21/1994, Entered: 1/25/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/19/94 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 2/22/94 (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 1/19/94 for USA . ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/5/1993, Terminated: 11/5/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/3/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to January 19, 1994). Response due: 11/22/93 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of "errata" to complaint by ANTHONY LONGVAL JR. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing the filing of LONGVAL'S "errata" despite defects noted by the Clerk . ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/15/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service : 10/14/93. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith filed. Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #34959. Answer due on 11/9/93. (AB)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 256 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?