TINSLEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00617-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo TANNGENIA HUMPHREY TINSLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhonda Kay Schnare
Office COFC
Filed 10/4/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/16/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, taken at Arlington, Virginia, for date of May 19, 1994. Notice to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: 6/17/1994 Terminated:
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TANNGENIA HUMPHREY TINSLEY, USA. Service: 6/13/94. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: 6/17/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1994, Entered: 5/24/1994 Terminated:
        Status Conference held (Transcript due 6/20/94). (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 10:30 5/19/94 ; ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT filed by leave of Judge. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 4/1/94 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994, Terminated: 3/4/1994 Terminated:
                MOTION by TANNGENIA HUMPHREY TINSLEY (Service : 2/24/94 ) to Extend Time to file joint status report (to April 1, 1994). (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/1994, Entered: 1/5/1994 Terminated:
                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 1/3/94 ( JPSR due 2/22/94 ) (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Terminated:
                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 1/3/94 for USA . (signed by Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993, Terminated: 11/18/1993 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/18/93) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to January 2, 1994). Response due: 12/6/93 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/27/1993, Entered: 11/1/1993 Terminated:
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rhonda Kay Schnare. Service : 10/27/93 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/6/1993, Entered: 10/7/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                          ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference, and precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held . ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/4/1993, Entered: 10/5/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/4/1993, Entered: 10/5/1993 Terminated:
                              COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35124. Answer due on 12/3/93. (AB)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?