ESTER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00014-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES J. ESTER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Franklin Elgin White, Jr. +1 202 307 6462 +1 202 514 7969 franklin.white@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/12/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $200000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/31/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995
(FE)
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995
    MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated May 30, 1995, affirmed [27-1] appeal by CHARLES J. ESTER. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/15/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [27-1] appeal by CHARLES J. ESTER. CAFC NUMBER: 95-5017. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHARLES J. ESTER. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 037869. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [25-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [23-1] order (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994, Terminated: 9/21/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER (Service: 9/9/94 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [23-1] order . (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated:
              JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated Case
                Case closed. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [18-1] cross motion, granting [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment and directing Clerk to dismiss complaint with no costs (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: 6/24/1994 Terminated:
                    REPLY by CHARLES J. ESTER to response to [18-1] cross motion. Service: 6/13/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: 6/24/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to File reply brief (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994, Terminated: 6/23/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER (Service : 6/13/94 ) for Leave to File reply brief out of time. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by USA to [18-1] cross motion for summary judgment. Service: 5/5/94. Reply due: 5/23/94. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994, Terminated: 8/30/1994 Cross MotionCourt Filing
                            CROSS MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER ( Service: 4/5/94 ) and RESPONSE to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/31/94 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994, Terminated: 8/31/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 5/6/94 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994 Terminated:
                                NOTICE of plaintiff new address by CHARLES J. ESTER (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                  Administrative record contained in an enveloped with microfiche filed by USA. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File administrative records and, granting [14-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994, Terminated: 3/9/1994 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/94) for Leave to File administrative records and , for Waiver of Duplication Response due: 2/17/94 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/94) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 3/31/94 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/28/94 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying [6-1] cross motion for summary judgment ; directing defendant to respond to complaint by 4/12/93 ; and file a Joint Preliminary Status Report by 4/11/94 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via federal express. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER (Service : ) to Strike [7-1] motion reply by USA Response due: 4/12/93 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                ORDER entered allowing plaintiff's motion to strike to be filed; and advising parties that it shall be treated as plaintiff's reply to defendant's opposition to motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA filed by leave of the judge. Service: 6/7/93 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] cross motion, [5-1] motion to Dismiss filed by leave of the judge. Service: 6/7/93 (FE) Modified on 03/17/1994
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994, Terminated: 1/26/1994 Terminated:
                                                      CROSS MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER ( Service: 4/28/93 ) and RESPONSE to [5-1] motion to Dismiss by USA filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 4/12/93 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/10/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/93 ) to Dismiss Response due: 4/12/93 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Franklin Elgin White Jr. Service : 1/19/93 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994, Terminated: 1/12/1993 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by CHARLES J. ESTER to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?