SWERDLOW v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00030-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES SWERDLOW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil B. Kabatchnick +1 202 872 1051
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/21/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/20/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994
Case closed. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994 Terminated:
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. Nature Jgm DP (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated:
      STATUS REPORT by CHARLES SWERDLOW and USA. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/13/1994 Terminated:
        STATUS REPORT by CHARLES SWERDLOW, USA Service: 5/9/94 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Terminated:
          STATUS REPORT by CHARLES SWERDLOW, USA. Service to plaintiff: 3/25/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated:
            JOINT STATUS REPORT. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/18/1993 Terminated:
              JOINT STATUS REPORT. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                ORDER entered directing parties to file Joint Status Report immediately following issuance of administrative decision by the Army . ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/1/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                  STATUS REPORT by CHARLES SWERDLOW and USA. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                    Deadline updated; setting Status Report deadline to 2/1/93 . (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/21/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 11/2/93 and at 3 month intervals as long as case remains in suspension. ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 8/2/93 ( JPSR due 9/20/93 ) (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 8/2/93 for USA . ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993, Terminated: 6/2/1993 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/28/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 31, 1993). Response due: 6/14/93 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/11/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay; setting Answer deadline to 6/1/93 for USA . ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                RESPONSE by USA to [4-1] motion to Stay. Service: 2/1/93 Reply due: 2/16/93 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/27/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service : 1/27/93 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993, Terminated: 2/11/1993 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by CHARLES SWERDLOW to Stay . Copies (2) to USA. Response due: 2/4/93 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                        NOTICE of related cases [none] by CHARLES SWERDLOW. Copies (5) to USA. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 33017. [Answer due on 3/22/93] (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?