YORK ASSOC., INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00121-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo YORK ASSOCIATES, INC., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 3/3/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/5/1993
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 91-3094[District of Columbia]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995
**Not member of bar flag removed. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Record Transferred Out
    All original papers comprising the transfer record, together with certified copies of docket entries, Order, and Judgment, returned to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Order
      ORDER from the U. S. District Court for the District of Columbia, dated 2/24/93, Vacating the 2/18/93 transfer order . Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
          Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, case number 91-3094 (CRR), consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Attorney: John J. Knapp) (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Set/Clear Flags
            **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: 4/7/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 66 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?