ROMING, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00129-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo BEN D. ROMING, Plaintiff

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
No Logo BR&D CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
No Logo JO-BEK FARM PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeri Kaylene Somers +1 202 626 5800
Office COFC
Filed 3/5/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $108000
Nature of Suit 516 - Miscellaneous - Damages
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 1/7/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/7/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered that plaintiffs recover the sum of $85,000, with each party to bear its own costs and expenses, including attorneys' fees. (signed by Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/7/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 1/5/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994 Stipulation
        Stipulation by BEN D. ROMING, BR&D CORPORATION, JO-BEK FARM, and USA for entry of judgment. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Stay proceedings. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994, Terminated: 11/30/1993 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/29/93 ) to Stay proceedings (to December 31, 1993). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 10/1/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Stay proceedings. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994, Terminated: 10/1/1993 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/28/93 ) to Stay proceedings (to November 29, 1993). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 8/16/93 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by BEN D. ROMING, BR&D CORPORATION, and JO-BEK FARM amending [1-1] complaint. Service by hand: 8/4/93 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994, Terminated: 7/2/1993 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/11/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to August 9, 1993). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994, Terminated: 5/7/1993 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/4/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to June 25, 1993). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/12/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeri Kaylene Somers. Service : 3/12/93 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 1/12/1994 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 33430. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?