LINDLEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00140-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TYRONE S. LINDLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M. Carpenter +1 785 357 5251
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund W. Chapman
Office COFC
Filed 3/11/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 9/16/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [14-1] motion for voluntary Dismissal. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994, Terminated: 9/16/1993 Terminated:
        MOTION by TYRONE S. LINDLEY (Service : 9/10/93 ) for voluntary Dismissal . (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 9/2/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 8/27/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994, Terminated: 9/2/1993 Terminated:
            MOTION by TYRONE S. LINDLEY (Service : 8/25/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to September 13, 1993). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994, Terminated: 8/18/1993 Terminated:
                MOTION by TYRONE S. LINDLEY (Service : 8/13/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to August 30, 1993). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994, Terminated: 8/4/1993 Terminated:
                    MOTION by TYRONE S. LINDLEY (Service : 7/28/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to Autust 14, 1993). (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/93 ) to Dismiss , together with Appendix (in two volumes). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994, Terminated: 5/7/1993 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/5/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to June 30, 1993). (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER entered re: Special Procedures. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Edmund W. Chapman. Service : 3/19/93 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/6/1994 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 33448 (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?