COWAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00182-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES MICHAEL COWAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victoria Rodman Troxell
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/30/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/23/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 96 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint without prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 95 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 94 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: Motion for appropriate substitution under the rules, etc., by (within 90 days of this order) Filing deadline of 9/9/99 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 93 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [92-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a repsonse to defendant's latest response to this Court's 9/25/95 order reset Notice of Compliance (response to Supplemental Administrative Record) deadline to 4/17/97 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 92 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997, Terminated: 3/19/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION [filed by leave of the Judge] by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service: 3/3/97) to Extend Time within which to file a repsonse to defendant's latest response to this Court's 9/25/95 order . Response due: 3/20/97. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 91 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Terminated:
              MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 2/5/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney JAMES MICHAEL COWAN for JAMES MICHAEL COWAN, attorney Bruce E. Hodge for JAMES MICHAEL COWAN Added Victoria Rodman Troxell. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 90 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                SUPPLEMENTAL Administrative record filed by USA by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 97 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 6/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [88-1] motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated ( Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 88 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997, Terminated: 1/7/1996 Terminated:
                    MOTION by Bruce Hodge (Service: 12/5/96) to Withdraw as Attorney . (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 87 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 2/14/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 86 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/9/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time to resport to the Court and reset Status Report deadline to 12/9/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 84 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 12/3/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service : 11/27/96. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 83 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996, Terminated: 12/2/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/22/96) to Extend Time to resport to the Court [to Febraury 14, 1996]. Response due: 12/9/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 82 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [81-1] motion to Extend Time to file report of disability rating and reset Status Report deadline to 11/22/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 81 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996, Terminated: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/96) to Extend Time to file report of disability rating (to November 22, 1996). (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 80 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                    NOTICE of change of address by Steven Eric Gordon (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [78-1] motion to Extend Time within which to report to the Court and reset Status Report deadline to 8/21/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996, Terminated: 5/28/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/96 ) to Extend Time within which to report to the Court , (until August 21, 1996). (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 77 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time to file report re: order dated 9/25/95 and reset Status Report deadline to 5/22/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 76 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996, Terminated: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/19/96) to Extend Time to file report re: order dated 9/25/95 (to May 22, 1996). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 75 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time to file report and reset Status Report deadline to 4/22/96 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 74 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/21/96) to Extend Time to file report until 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 1/7/1996, Entered: 1/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [88-1] motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Bruce E. Hodge for JAMES MICHAEL COWAN ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Eric Gordon Service : 12/15/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time to submit declarations [no provisions in Rules] (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 14, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Remanding to the Army Board for Correction of Military Records ( Agency Decision due 3/22/96 ). ( Status Report due 4/19/96 ) ; and cancelling hearing scheduled for October 3, 4 and 6, 1995 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ). Copy to parties; certified copy to ABCMR. (DS) Modified on 10/12/1995
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA filed as "Deftendant's Recommendation for Remand." Service: 9/18/95 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Separate Status report [re: position regarding whether Court should remand this matter to ABCMR] due on COB 9/18/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copies to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Status Conference
                                                                Status Conference held. ( Transcript due 10/16/95 ) (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                  RESPONSE by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service: 9/8/95 ) to [65-1] motion to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution. Reply due: 9/25/95 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 3:30pm, on 9/14/95 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/31/95) to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution . Response due: 10/2/95 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Compel production of witness list, granting [63-2] motion to Extend Time to file witness and exhibit lists and reset Plaintiff and Defendant's Expert Witness List and Defendant's exhibit list deadline to 8/31/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995, Terminated: 8/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/15/95) to Compel production of witness list and to Extend Time to file witness and exhibit lists [to 8/28/95]. Response due: 9/1/95 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Transcript
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 20, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER entere directing the parties to submit a Joint Witness and Joint Exhibit list by 8/18/95 [the other documents required by App. G are not required to be filed], scheduling Hearing to be held on 10/3/95 and 10/4/95 in or around Oklahoma City, OK and 10/6/95 in Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Status Conference
                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/21/95 ) (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [58-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Status Report and Reply to Status Report and Memorandum Regarding Location of the Evidentiary Hearing ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER entered setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. at 7/20/95 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995, Terminated: 7/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/13/95 ) for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Status Report and Reply to Status Report and Memorandum Regarding Location of the Evidentiary Hearing . Response due: 7/31/95 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN. Service: 6/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [55-1] motion for Leave to File status report and set plaintiff's Status Report deadline to 7/17/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995, Terminated: 6/30/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/28/95) for Leave to File status report and status report. Response due: 7/17/95 (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [53-1] motion to Extend Time to submit joint status report reset Status Report deadline to 6/28/95 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995, Terminated: 6/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/26/95) to Extend Time to submit joint status report until 6/28/95. Response due: 7/10/95 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995, Terminated: 6/28/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/26/95 (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 6/7/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 6/26/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER entered granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to submit reply to motion to remand ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN to [46-1] memorandum by USA filed by leave of the judge. Service: 5/17/95 (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995, Terminated: 5/19/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                          MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 5/12/95 ) to Extend Time to submit reply to motion to remand (to May 16, 1995). Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/30/95.(FE) Modified on 05/17/1995
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 5/8/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by USA re: supplementary response to Plaintiff's notice regarding satisfaction of determination on remand and [44-1] report by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN. Service: 5/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER set Defendant's Brief re: additional evidence for evidentary hearing deadline to 5/8/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by USA re: [44-1] report by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN. Service: 4/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 7, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN Service: 3/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER entered re discusion at status conference. Plaintiff is directed to file a brief addressing whether an evidentiary hearing is appropriate ; set Brief deadline to 3/31/95 , with response by April 28, 1995 ; set Motion Filing deadline to 4/28/95 , and reply by May 12, 1995 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/12/95 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Status Conference
                                                                                                                        Status Conference held (Transcript due 4/6/95). (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER entered scheduling Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 3/7/95 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM [i.e., status report regarding satisfaction of determination on remand] by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN re: [37-1] order. Service: 2/20/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Decision by AgencyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Decision by Department of the Army. Copy to parties and to Judge. (Attached to status report filed this day) (DS)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/23/95 (Agency decision on remand attached to status report) (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dorann Elise Banks Service: 12/19/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/2/1994 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                    Administrative Record in four (4) volumes returned to defendant's attorney pursuant to Rule 60.1. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/2/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [34-2] motion to Remand to Secretary of the Army ( Agency Decision due 1/23/95 ). ( Status Report due 2/22/95 ). ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties and certified copy to the ABCMR. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/6/1994, Entered: 9/7/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [34-1] motion for Clarification of 7/29/94 order. Service: 9/6/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN to [34-1] motion for Clarification of 7/29/94 order, [34-2] motion to Remand to Secretary of the Army Service: 8/25/94 Reply due: 9/8/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/12/94) for Clarification of 7/29/94 order and to Remand to Secretary of the Army . Response due: 8/29/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [16-1] cross motion, denying [6-1] motion to Dismiss/summary judgment with determination of the amount of recovery in further proceedings. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/9/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN to statement of facts filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/3/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/7/1994 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN to response to [16-1] cross motion [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 2/3/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: 2/3/1994 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER allowing plaintiff's reply brief to be filed by leave of the judge provided an original and index are filed within three days of receipt of order. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/28/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/31/94 for [16-1] cross motion . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to objection to cross-motion for partial summary judgment; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/26/94 for [16-1] cross motion, reset to 1/26/94 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994, Terminated: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 1/25/94 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to January 31, 1994). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/19/1994, Entered: 1/24/1994, Terminated: 1/26/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 1/12/94 ) to Extend Time to reply to objection to cross-motion for partial summary judgment (to January 26, 1994). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/19/1994, Entered: 1/24/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN. Service: 1/12/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/5/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/30/93 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/1993, Entered: 1/3/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [16-1] cross motion. Service: 12/30/93 Reply due: 1/18/94 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 12/14/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to file its reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/30/93 for [16-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/13/1993, Terminated: 12/14/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/93 ) to Extend Time to file its reply brief (to December 30, 1993). Response due: 12/27/93 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993
                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; Response to [16-1] cross-motion reset to 12/17/93 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File objection and memorandum out of time. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John Wilson, Ph.D. by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN by leave of the Judge. Service 11/16/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN by leave of the Judge. Service 11/16/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/16/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993, Terminated: 7/29/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION for partial summary judgment by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN ( Service: 11/16/93 ), RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, and to remand this case to ABCMR by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/17/93. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/17/1993, Entered: 11/18/1993, Terminated: 11/23/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 11/16/93 ) for Leave to File objection and memorandum out of time . Response due: 12/3/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss; Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/15/93, [6-2] motion for judgment upon the Administrative Record reset to 11/15/93 . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by JAMES MICHAEL COWAN (Service : 10/25/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to November 15, 1993) Response due: 11/12/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered directing the return, unfiled, of COWAN'S motion for extension of time . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative record (comprised of four volumes) filed by USA. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record, granting [8-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993, Terminated: 8/4/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/2/93 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record , and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 8/19/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 8/2/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/2/93 ) to Dismiss , or for judgment upon the Administrative Record . Response due: 9/2/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/19/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 8/2/93 for USA . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993, Terminated: 5/19/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/17/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 31, 1993). Response due: 6/3/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered re: Special Procedures . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brian Michael Simkin. Service : 4/7/93 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 33575. [Answer due on 6/1/93] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?