WEBB v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00210-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID L. WEBB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Warren
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Kinsella +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 4/12/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 9/30/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [18-1] motion to Alter, denying [18-2] motion to Amend [17-1] judgment order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993, Terminated: 10/14/1993 Terminated:
    MOTION by DAVID L. WEBB (Service : 10/7/93 ) to Alter , and to Amend [17-1] judgment order . Response due: 8/9/93 (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 9/30/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties; WEBB served via Fed. Ex. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 8/9/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 8/9/93 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/27/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief ; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/9/93 for [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993, Terminated: 7/27/1993 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/93 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to August 9, 1993). Response due: 8/9/93 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 AffidavitCourt Filing
                  AFFIDAVIT in support of [11-1] response to motion for summary judgment (by leave of Judge) by DAVID L. WEBB. Service 7/19/93 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                    RESPONSE by DAVID L. WEBB to [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/15/93 ( Reply due: 8/2/93 ) (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment; Response to [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 7/16/93 . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993, Terminated: 7/12/1993 Terminated:
                        MOTION by DAVID L. WEBB (Service : 7/8/93 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment (to July 23, 1993). Response due: 7/26/93 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Administrative Record
                          Administrative record filed by USA. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record, granting [4-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Statement of Facts
                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 6/11/93 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/11/93 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 7/12/93 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993, Terminated: 6/15/1993 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/11/93 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record , and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 6/28/93 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Michael Kinsella. Service : 4/19/93 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 33765. [Answer due on 6/11/93] (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?