UNION FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00671-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo UNION FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF FRANKTON, Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo UNION FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF INDIANAPOLIS, Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo UNION HOLDING COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 11/2/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $50000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/24/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 68, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $50,000,000.00, with each party to bear its own costs, fees and expenses. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998
      Joint Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by USA to [49-1] response [proposed order] by UNION HOLDING, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION FEDERAL. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION HOLDING to [48-1] response by USA Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by USA to the Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] cross motion . Service: 2/13/98 (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/13/98 for [33-1] cross motion. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arlene Pianko Groner. Service: 2/5/98. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: 1/28/1998, Terminated: 2/10/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/22/98 ) to Extend Time to reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment [until February 13, 1998.] Response due: 2/9/98 (CDC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/12/98 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief. (to January 23, 1998). (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/31/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/97 ) to Extend Time to their reply to plaintiff's response to their cross motion for partial summary judgment as to liability [to January 10, 1998] Response due: 1/8/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by UNION FEDERAL (Service: 11/10/97 ) to [33-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/5/98 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [38-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation., granting [38-2] motion for Leave to File motion to exceed ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/21/1997, Terminated: 11/21/1997 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION HOLDING (Service: 11/10/97) For leave to exceed the page limitation. , and for Leave to File motion to exceed (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: 11/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief Response to [33-1] cross motion reset to 11/10/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997, Terminated: 11/6/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by UNION FEDERAL (Service : 10/23/97 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to November 10, 1997). (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 notice of filing
                                        Supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5(d) of the Omnibus Case Management Order by USA Service: 10/2/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/3/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/29/97) to Extend Time to submit its supplemental response to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability until 10/3/97. Response due: 10/16/97. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                            CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 8/8/97 ) and RESPONSE to [29-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability by UNION HOLDING, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION FEDERAL. Response due: (28 days after service of 120 day filing) (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/97 ) to Extend Time to August 8, 1997, to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/97 ) out of time to Extend Time to August 7, 1997, to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 8/15/97 (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service : 6/25/97 (AB)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION HOLDING (Service : 5/22/97 ) for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability i, together with separate one volume appendix. An IN CAMERA version and a REDACTED version filed. Response due: 6/23/97. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rodger Daniel Citron. Service: 12/11/96. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee McWethy Straus Service: 8/27/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/96 ) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/6/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by William Patrick Donovan Jr. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/25/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                    RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge), by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION HOLDING (Service: 5/8/96) to [20-1] motion for Leave to File a of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER mooting [13-1] motion for Leave to File response to defendant's request for a stay (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SEE ORDER in 90-581C re stay & filing of papers under stay . (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                RESPONSE by UNION FEDERAL (Service: 11/2/95) to Defendant's motion to stay [treating status report as motion to stay]. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File response to defendant's request for a stay (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995, Terminated: 11/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., UNION HOLDING (Service : 11/2/95) for Leave to File response to defendant's request for a stay . Response due: 11/20/95 (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Status Report
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by UNION FEDERAL. Service: 10/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Patrick Donovan Jr. Service: 10/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SEE 90-581C FOR STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 10/18/95 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copies to parties. (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Kent Olivier. Service: 7/3/95 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/11/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV. and UNION HOLDING, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/5/95 (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ellen Mary McElligott Service : 3/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/9/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joan Mary Bernott. Service : 11/9/93 (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Staying proceedings pending rehearing of WINSTAR CORP., ET AL. before the C.A.F.C. , and scheduling Notice of Compliance deadline [any objections to the stay] to 12/6/93 . ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/2/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of related cases (90-8C; et al) by UNION FEDERAL, UNION FEDERAL SAV., and UNION HOLDING. Service: 11/2/93. (AB)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/2/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35314. Answer due on 1/3/94. (AB)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?