LEWIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00685-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo GRACE LEWIS, Plaintiff

Represented by Towne Center, Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome M. Capone +1 302 654 3260
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Patrick Murphy +1 202 362 0840
Office COFC
Filed 11/8/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $25000
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/30/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/13/1994, Entered: 6/16/1994 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER entered directing defendant to answer complaint and parties to file a joint status report within ten days of receipt of this order. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/1/1994 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GRACE LEWIS. [Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)]. Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/1/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 3/30/94 for USA . (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994, Terminated: 3/3/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/25/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to March 30, 1994). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/28/94 for USA ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: 2/6/1994, Terminated: 2/7/1994 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/3/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to February 28, 1994). Response due: 2/22/94 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/1994, Entered: 1/7/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 2/7/94 for USA . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994, Terminated: 1/6/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/4/94) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to February 7, 1994). Response due: 1/21/94 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/2/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re: special procedures (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/1/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Patrick Murphy Service : 12/1/93 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein . Copy to parties. (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35368. Answer due on 1/7/94. (AB)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 71 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?