WILSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00244-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES WILSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 4/22/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 4/23/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 CAFC Mandate DismissingCourt Filing
MANDATE dated 7/30/93 (certified copy) dismissed [6-1] appeal by JAMES WILSON. Copy to Judge. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Terminated:
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by JAMES WILSON . Copy to USA and to C.A.F.C. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [6-1] appeal by JAMES WILSON. CAFC NUMBER: 93-5136 (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Dismissing Complaint . ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Complaint
              COMPLAINT. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993, Terminated: 4/22/1993 Terminated:
                  MOTION by JAMES WILSON to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 10/13/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    CASE assigned to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 92 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?