NONPROFITS', et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00325-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NONPROFITS' INSURANCE ALLIANCE OF CALIFORNIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Duncan Terry +1 202 887 0330
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/24/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/18/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated:
JUDGMENT entered pursuant Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION Dismissing complaint and directing Clerk to enter judgment with no costs (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 34 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated:
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 2, 1994 . Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 Terminated:
          Argument held - tax case (Transcript due 12/2/94). (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 9/20/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            ORDER granting [31-1] motion to reschedule oral argument and reset Evidentiary Hearing for merits arguments: 2:00 p.m. on 11/2/94 (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994 Terminated:
              NOTICE of related case [94-604T] by USA. Service: 9/19/94 (FE) Modified on 09/22/1994
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 9/16/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994, Terminated: 9/20/1994 Terminated:
                MOTION by NONPROFITS' (Service: 9/16/94) to reschedule oral argument . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 8/17/1994, Entered: 8/23/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  ORDER entered re: Argument on the parties' briefs on the merits shall be held at 2:00 p.m., on Wednesday, October 5, 1994 ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA to [20-1] response by NONPROFITS'. Service: 7/21/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 28 Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA to [21-1] memorandum by NONPROFITS'. Service: 7/21/94. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/7/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File errata sheet to reply to response to proposed findings of fact, granting [25-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental authority ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994, Terminated: 7/7/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by NONPROFITS' (Service : 7/1/94 ) for Leave to File errata sheet to reply to response to proposed findings of fact Response due: 7/18/94 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994 Terminated:
                            MOTION by NONPROFITS' (Service : 7/1/94 ) for Leave to File supplemental authority Response due: 7/18/94 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief and reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's proposed findings of fact resetting reply Brief deadline to 7/22/94 ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 6/30/1994, Terminated: 6/30/1994 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/29/94) to Extend Time to file reply brief and reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's proposed findings of fact [to July 22, 1994]. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 Terminated:
                                  MEMORANDUM [i.e. reply brief] by NONPROFITS' re: [16-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/1/94 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by NONPROFITS' to [15-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 6/1/94. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by NONPROFITS' to [14-1] response by USA. Service: 6/1/94 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/31/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 Terminated:
                                        NOTICE of change of address by NONPROFITS' Service: 5/31/94 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's brief reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/1/94 (signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/23/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994, Terminated: 5/24/1994 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by NONPROFITS' (Service : 5/23/94 ) to Extend Time within whicht o respond to defendant's brief , (until June 1, 1994). Response due: 6/9/94. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                              BRIEF for the USA on the merits. Service: 4/25/94 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA Service: 4/25/94 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [11-1] findings of fact by NONPROFITS' Service: 4/25/94 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                                    Deadline updated; plaintiff's reply to defendant's response to proposed findings of fact shall be filed no later than 5/25/94 with defendant can reply due 30 days from service. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA, NONPROFITS'. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Terminated:
                                                        MEMORANDUM [i.e. Brief on the Merits] by NONPROFITS'. Service: 2/22/94 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Terminated:
                                                          FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by NONPROFITS'. Service: 2/22/94 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file brief on the merits and proposed findings of fact; resetting Brief and proposed findings of fact deadline to 2/22/94 . ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994, Terminated: 1/13/1994 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by NONPROFITS' (Service : 1/11/94 ) to Extend Time to file brief on the merits and proposed findings of fact (to February 22, 1994). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/6/1993 Terminated:
                                                                Supplemental Administrative record filed by NONPROFITS'. Service: 12/3/93 (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: 10/27/1993 Terminated:
                                                                  Administrative record filed by USA Service: 10/22/93. (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/23/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines: USA to file Administrative Record 10/22/93; NONPROFIT'S to file notice re: A.R. 45 days from service - USA's reply due 21 days from service of notice; NONPROFIT'S brief and proposed findings to be filed 60 days from resolution of contents of A.R. - USA'S reply due 30 days from service. ( signed by Judge Christine C. Nettesheim ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated:
                                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated:
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/23/93 ( JPSR due 9/9/93 ) (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated:
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service : 5/27/93 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/24/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine C. Nettesheim . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/1993, Entered: 9/13/1993 Terminated:
                                                                              COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 34131. [Answer due on 7/23/93] (FE)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?