GROMO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:93-cv-00371-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LOUIS L. GROMO, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 6/14/1993
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 6/24/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) of the CAFC dated November 30, 1993, affirming the Court of Federal Claims decision re [4-1] appeal by LOUIS L. GROMO. (HW) Modified on 12/03/1993
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Terminated:
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by LOUIS L. GROMO . Copy to USA and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 34501. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [4-1] appeal by LOUIS L. GROMO. CAFC NUMBER: 93-5161. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/24/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered dismissing the complaint sua sponte. (signed by Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Dismissing Complaint . ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              CASE assigned to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Complaint
                COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 34288. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 126 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?