WILLINGHAM v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00519-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo N. JEROME WILLINGHAM, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Salomon Gomez +1 202 616 0339
Office COFC
Filed 8/10/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $12000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/10/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated January 10, 1997, affirmed [37-1] order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/13/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996
    CAFC Case Number Re: [39-1] appeal by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5127. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996, Terminated: 1/10/1997 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM. Copy to USA, Judge Horn and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 042038. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Judgment*
          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 according to court's opinion filed June 6, 1996 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION denying [15-1] cross motion, denying [6-1] motion to Dismiss and granting [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Statement of Facts
                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 4/11/96. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Statement of Facts
                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM. Service: 4/11/96. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Stipulation
                    Joint Stipulation of facts filed by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM and USA. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Terminated:
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service: 4/10/96) to Extend Time within which to respond to the Court's February 23, 1996 order (to April 12, 1996). Response due: (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM (Service : 4/1/96 ) to Dismiss filed as Amended Complaint. Response due: 5/3/96. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/2/96) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 2/23/96 order until 4/19/96. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996 Transcript
                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 23, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER set Brief [stipulation of facts] deadline to 4/2/96 , set Amended Pleadings deadline to 4/2/96 , Staying pending parties' further articulation of the facts, etc. and dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claim for uniform costs (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Oral Argument
                                Oral Argument re: [15-1] cross motion by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM. ( Transcript due 3/25/96 ) (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 2/23/96 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss and [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File response to plaintiff's filing of new correspondence and accompanying document (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/95 ) for Leave to File response to plaintiff's filing of new correspondence and accompanying document . Response due: 12/26/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/24/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/22/95 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          MOTION [i.e. letter] by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM (Service: 9/13/95) requesting status of case and for a trial if motion for summary judgment is denied by leave of Judge. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER filingPlaintiff's correspondence dated September 13, 1995 by leave of Judge (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez. Service: 9/20/95. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/22/95) to [15-1] cross motion. Reply due: 3/13/95 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 Memorandum
                                                  MEMORANDUM by USA re: [14-1] memorandum by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM. Service: 2/22/95 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 2/22/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File corrected reply and response to motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995, Terminated: 3/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/22/95) for Leave to File corrected reply and response to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 3/10/95 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER entered returning defendant's reply and opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment for defect per Rule 56(d). Defendant is ordered to correct the defective filing (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            CROSS MOTION by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM (Service: 12/22/94) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA and [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA with ONE VOLUME EXHIBIT by leave of Judge. Response due: 1/23/95. (FE) Modified on 01/20/1995
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM re: proposed additional facts by leave of Judge. Service: 12/22/94 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM by leave of Judge. Service: 12/22/94 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions and filing by leave of Judge this day (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] cross motion reset to 1/23/95 . (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994, Terminated: 1/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by N. JEROME WILLINGHAM (Service: 12/22/94) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions [to December 23, 1994]. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion to enlarge time, declaration, proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, opposition to Defendant's 12(b)(4) and 56.1 motion; motion for summary judgment and appendix for untimeliness, proof of service not attached, does not comply with Rules 56.1(b) and 82(c) (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Administrative Record
                                                                          Administrative record [2 volumes] filed by USA. (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER entered granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File Administrative Record (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994, Terminated: 11/23/1994 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/94) for Leave to File Administrative Record . Response due: 10/28/94 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/94) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment [with one volume appendix] by leave of Judge. Response due: 11/14/94 (FE) Modified on 10/25/1994
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 10/11/94 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER filing Defendant's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment by leave of Judge (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/19/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Parker McLish. Service: 8/16/94 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37384. Answer due on 10/11/94. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?