FIRST ANNAPOLIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00522-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COOTER, MANGOLD, DECKELBAUM & KARAS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Andrew Cooter +1 202 537 0700 +1 202 364 3664 DCooter@cootermangold.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott David Austin Scott.Austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/10/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $50000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status PstTrlBrf
Flag ECF
  Entries (394) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 405 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION dismissing this action without prejudice for lack of standing; denying defendant's request for costs, and directing the Clerk to vacate the October 28, 2009 judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Legal Document 366 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Concerning The Federal Circuit's Decision In Amber Resources v. United States, filed by all defendants. (Austin, Scott)
      LREF
      Legal Document 365 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
      POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
        LREF
        Legal Document 364 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER Supplemental briefing due by 9/12/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 363 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Response due by 9/12/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cooter, Dale)
            LREF
            Legal Document 362 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Court Filing
            NOTICE TO THE PARTIES. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 361 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Court Filing
              ORDER denying [359] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 360 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                RESPONSE to [359] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/17/2007. (Austin, Scott)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 359 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007, Terminated: 3/21/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                  MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Response due by 12/3/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooter, Dale)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 358 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                    POST TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 357 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                      POST TRIAL BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL, filed by USA. (Sanchez, Delisa)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 356 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Austin for USA. (Austin, Scott)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 355 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (page 2617-2695) held on August 3, 2007 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 354 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Closing Argument set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 353 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF Response, filed by USA. (Abraham, Timothy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 352 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                POST TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Post-Trial Brief, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 351 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                  RESPONSE to [350] MOTION scheduling Of Closing Argument, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Reply due by 8/3/2007. (Cooter, Dale)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 350 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007
                                    MOTION scheduling, filed by USA.Response due by 8/3/2007.(Abraham, Timothy)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 349 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [348] Motion for Extension of Time Post Trial Briefs due 7/23/2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 348 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/23/07 to to respond to the parties' post-trial briefs, filed by USA.Response due by 7/16/2007.(Pittman, Mark)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 347 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Abraham, Timothy)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 346 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                            Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 345 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Abraham for USA. (Abraham, Timothy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 344 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1989-2616) held on March 27-30, 2007 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 343 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1877-1988) held on March 26, 2007 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 342 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 9051876) held on March 19-23, 2007 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 341 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007
                                                      MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, filed by USA.Response due by 4/23/2007.(Evans, Richard)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 340 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER adopting joint stipulationsof pre-trial and trial procedures. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 339 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-65) held on March 8, 2007 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 338 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT, filed by USA. First Amendment to Contentions of Fact and Law. (Attachments: # (1))(Evans, Richard)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 337 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                              STIPULATION of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedures, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 336 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER finding Plaintiff's motion to admit deposition testimony into the record moot; and, granting Defendant's motion to serve subpoenas pursuant to RCFC 45(b)(2). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 335 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007
                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Defendant's Expert Report (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Evans, Richard)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 334 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007
                                                                    MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, filed by USA.Response due by 3/22/2007.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 333 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007
                                                                      RESPONSE to [329] MOTION for Leave to File To Admit Deposition Testimony Of David Cook, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/19/2007. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 332 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007
                                                                        RESPONSE to [325] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Plaintiff's New Claim For Reliance Damages, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Reply due by 3/19/2007. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 331 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                          RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections To Our Trial Exhibits, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 330 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            OPINION and ORDER denying [314] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 329 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File To Admit Deposition Testimony Of David Cook, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Response due by 3/19/2007.(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 328 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [326] Motion for Extension of Time Clowery Expert Report due by 3/8/2007. Defendant's amendments to its Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 3/8/2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 327 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [304] Exhibit List filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1))(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 326 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007, Terminated: 3/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2007 to To File The Report Of The Government's Expert Responding To Plaintiff's Tax Gross-Up Claim And Amendments To Defendant's Contentions Of Fact And Law, filed by USA.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Sanchez, Delisa)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 325 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                      MOTION in Limine To Exclude Plaintiff's New Claim For Reliance Damages, filed by USA.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 324 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 323 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                          Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 322 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                            Witness List, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 321 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [314] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [308] Published Opinion, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 320 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Revised Exhibit List as instructed in Order due by 2/23/2007. Defendant's Response to Remaining Objections due by 3/2/2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 319 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [314] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [308] Published Opinion, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Reply due by 3/6/2007. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 318 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA Identification Of Expert Witness (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 317 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007
                                                                                                      Objection to Exhibit List, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. Related document: [299] Scheduling Order,,.(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 316 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 315 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER directing expedited briefing.Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for reconsideration is due 2/20/2007; Defendant's reply due 2/23/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 314 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [308] Published Opinion, filed by USA.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 313 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's amended memorandum of contentions of fact and law is due 2/14/07; Defendant's memorandum of contentions of fact and law is due 2/23/07; motions in limine are due 2/28/07; responses to motions in limine are due 3/05/07. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 312 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying [305] Defendant's Motion in Limine and granting Alternative Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 311 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [298] Defendant's Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 310 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [305] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Newly Disclosed Witness From Trial, Alternative Motion For Discovery, And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [305] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Newly Disclosed Witness From Trial, Alternative Motion For Discovery, And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Reply due by 2/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 308 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED OPINION on Prior Material Breach. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 307 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability and DENYING defendant's cross-motion. Telephonic status conference is set for 02/07/2007; Trial on damages is scheduled from March 19-30, 2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 1/31/2007 to edit docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 306 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond to [305] Motion in Limine no later than February 1, 2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 305 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007, Terminated: 2/6/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Newly Disclosed Witness From Trial, Alternative Motion For Discovery, And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2007.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 304 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Trial Exhibits, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 303 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 302 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 301 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [298] MOTION to Strike [296] Notice (Other), filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 300 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [298] MOTION to Strike [296] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Witness Identification, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Reply due by 1/3/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact along with witness and exhibits lists due by 1/15/2007; Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact along with witness and exhibits lists due 2/9/07; Motions in Limine and objections to exhibits due 2/16/07; Responses to Motions in Limine and objections to exhibits due 2/23/07; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2007 at 10:00 AM in US Court of Federal Claims before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial set for 3/19/2007 09:30 AM in US Court of Federal Claims before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 298 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike [296] Notice (Other), filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2006.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 297 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order re Joint Pre-Trial Schedule, filed by all parties. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 296 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Plaintiff's Supplemental Expert Witness Identification (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2))(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 295 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Status Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 11/24/2006.(Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 294 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                                                                                                                    Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 19, 2006 through June 22, 2006. Filed with Defendant Exhibits: 20,69,94,113,117,119,152,171-173,180,183,192,227,267,286,287,379,386,397,403,438,439,464,469,473,481,498,498-A,524,527,531,535,536,539,541,548,556,582,597,609,610,612-614,619,622,661,679 and 681. Joint Exhibits: 22,25,76,83,86,87,89,91,92-94,97-99,101,102-106,108,110-124,126,128-133,137 and 140. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 293 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-118) held on October 12, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/27/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 292 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [289] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 291 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [286] Post Trial Brief of Plaintiff Bancorp, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 290 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 289 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply Brief To Defendant's Post-Trial Brief by 10 pages, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Response due by 10/23/2006.(Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 288 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER to parties to file post-trial reply briefs regarding the issue of waiver of the service corporation investments claims.Notice of Compliance due by 10/4/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 287 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 286 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF ON PRIOR MATERIAL BREACH OF CONTRACT AND WAIVER, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.. (Cooter, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 285 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION and Order Sustaining Plaintiff's Objection to Hearsay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 284 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 283 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Acting Chief Judge James F. Merow for Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 282 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike DE BENE ESSE DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 281 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Brief due 9/18/2006. Post Trial Response Brief due 9/29/2006. Oral Argument set for 10/12/2006, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial scheduled for 10/2/2006 - 10/13/2006 is postponed. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 280 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                (Unopposed) MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. Service: 8/4/2006.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 279 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [276] MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Memorandum Concerning Agency , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Reply due by 8/2/2006. Service: 7/19/2006.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 278 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [276] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Memorandum Concerning Agency. Reply shall be accepted as of its filing on July 13, 2006, Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 277 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of Deposition Transcripts of David R. Thompson and Jeffrey C. Sweeney (also video files of the depositions in CD format), filed by USA Service: 7/17/2006.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 276 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006, Terminated: 7/17/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Memorandum Concerning Agency , filed by USA. Service: 7/13/2007.Response due by 7/31/2006.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 275 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                          POST TRIAL Memorandum Concerning Agency, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 274 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                            POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM CONCERNING AGENCY, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 6/30/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 273 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits and Transcript Excerpts in Other Winstar-Related Cases Regarding Goodwill Financial Reporting Packages, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/28/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 272 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-95) held on June 12, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 270 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-905) held on June 19-22, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/10/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Counter Designations to Defendant's Deposition Designations of Dr. Arthur Schwartz, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 269 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATIONS of Fact, filed by all parties. Service: 6/15/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/13/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File to Admit Portions of Dr. Arthur Schwartz's Deposition Testimony Into Evidence , filed by USA. Service: 6/14/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sequester William Jones , filed by USA. Service: 6/12/2006 by hand.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 266 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Joint Trial Schedule, filed by all parties. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 265 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [257] MOTION in Limine , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Reply due by 6/26/2006. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend[249] Exhibit List , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 6/12/2006.Response due by 6/29/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 263 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [256] MOTION in Limine , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Reply due by 6/26/2006. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [254] MOTION in Limine , filed by USA.Reply due by 6/26/2006. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 261 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Agenda for June 12, 2006 Pre-Trial Conference , filed by USA. Service: 6/12/2006.Response due by 6/29/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 260 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [255] MOTION in Limine , filed by USA.Reply due by 6/26/2006. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/13/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 259 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [252] Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 258 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [245] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 257 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Regarding Plaintiff's Hearsay Objections to Statements Made by Edwardo O. Wayson, filed by USA. Service: 6/8/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Declare Certain Witnesses as Adverse to Defendant , filed by USA. Service: 6/8/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 255 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Edward Wayson's Statements Regarding Agency, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 6/8/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 254 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 6/8/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 253 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedures, filed by all parties. Service: 6/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 252 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend [251] Defendant's Exhibit List , filed by USA. Service: 6/7/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Exhibit List, Plaintiff's Exhibit List, and Defendant's Exhibit List, filed by all parties. Service: 6/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 6/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 249 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Service: 6/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 248 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Service: 6/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 247 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of De Bene Esse Depositions for Jeffrey C. Sweeney and David R. Thompson, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/1/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 246 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [241] Motion to Amend/Correct, finding as moot [242] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 30, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 6/5/2006. Motion(s) in Limine due by 6/8/2006. Response due by 6/12/2006. Joint Witness and Exhibit List due by 6/6/2006. Hearing set for 6/12/2006 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/5/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 245 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006, Terminated: 6/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by USA. Service: 5/30/2006.Response due by 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [241] MOTION to Amend/Correct [235] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Reply due by 6/8/2006. Service: 5/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike James Anderson from Plaintiff's Witness List and to Preclude his Testimony, filed by USA. Service: 5/23/2006.Response due by 6/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 236 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 15, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 241 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct [235] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law , filed by USA. Service: 5/17/2006 by hand.Response due by 5/31/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 240 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/24/2006. Defendant's Motion for leave to amend due by 5/17/2006. Oral Argument set for 5/30/2006 09:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [237] Motion for Leave to Amend Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/22/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/15/2006 at 2:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006, Terminated: 5/16/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List , filed by USA. Service: 5/12/2006 by hand.Response due by 5/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 235 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by USA. Service: 5/8/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List filed by USA. Service: 5/8/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 233 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List filed by USA. Service: 5/8/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Response to Motions In Limine due by 6/12/2006. Defendant's Appendix A Filings due by 5/8/2006. Parties Joint Exhibit List due by 5/30/2006. Motion(s)In Limine due by 6/5/2006. Parties Joint Trial Schedule due by 6/12/2006. Plaintiff's Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 5/26/2006. Parties Joint Witness List due by 5/30/2006. Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2006 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial set for 6/19/2006-6/23/2006 in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Certification of Pretrial COnference Meeting, filed by all parties. Service: 4/27/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff to file its Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, exhibit list, and witness list by 5/8/06; Defendant to file its Memorandum, etc. by 5/26/06; parties to file a joint witness and exhibit list by 5/30/06 (5/29/06 is a federal holiday); motions in limine are to be filed by 6/5/06, with responses due by 6/12/06; parties to file a joint trial schedule by 6/12/06; Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial set to commence on 6/19/2006 through 6/23/06 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Transcripts, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/11/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 228 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. and USA. Service: 4/7/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 227 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 226 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Order Cancelling Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Cancelling the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for March 22, 2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery re: Defendant due by 4/3/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing attached subpoena, filed by USA. Service: 3/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 224 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING filed by USA. Attached subpoenas duces tecum, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 2/28/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 22, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: regarding depositions.Motion for a Protective Order due by 2/24/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/27/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 221 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 20, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/15/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY re [214] MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Expedite , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 2/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Authorizing Deposition. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Surreply to Motion for a Protective Order due by 2/8/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [214] MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Expedite , filed by USA. Service: 2/3/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [214] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Reply due by 2/3/2006. Service: 2/1/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [214] Motion to Expedite. Response due by 2/1/2006. Reply due by 2/3/2006. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2006 at 3:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 1/31/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order, and MOTION for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA. Service: 1/27/2006. Response due by 2/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Janaury 19, 2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Unpublished OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNPUBLISHED OPINION re: [207] MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions Out of Time filed by USA. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/22/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/17/2006. Status Conference set for 3/22/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial on the issue of prior material breach set for 6/19/2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial on the issue of damages set for 10/2/2006 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/3/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 210 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/19/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 209 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [207] MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions Out of Time , filed by USA. Service: 1/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 208 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [207] MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions Out of Time , filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Reply due by 1/6/2006. Service: 12/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Renewed MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions Out of Time , filed by USA. Service: 12/9/2005. Response due by 12/30/2005 (per order). (mb2, ) Modified on 1/3/2006 to correct due date for response. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 17, 2005 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/29/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING AUTHORIZING MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY: Motion due by 12/9/2005. Response due by 12/30/2005. Reply due by 1/6/2006. Status Conference set for 1/11/2006 at 12:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, ) Modified on 1/3/2006 to correct due date for response. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [203] Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 6/17/2005. Response due by 7/5/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [201] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005, Terminated: 6/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File supplemental authority filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC..Service: 6/1/05. Response due by 6/20/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Response to Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [199] Supplemental Brief, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 5/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [66] Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Service: 4/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-83) of Proceedings held on 3/24/05 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 4/15/2005. Plaintiff's Response and Supplemental Brief due by 5/6/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/24/2005 at 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [194] Motion for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Supplemental Authority by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC.Service: 2/9/05. Response due by 2/28/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [192] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005, Terminated: 1/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 01/25/05. Response due by 2/11/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [190] Motion for Leave to File supplemental authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 12/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File supplemental authority by USA.Service: 12/21/2004. Response due by 1/7/2005 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [188] Dft's 11/1/2004 Brief Regarding the Admiral Decision, and in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Further Opposition to the Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 12/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Service: 11/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the recent decisions of the US Court of Appeals for the Fed. Circuit in Admiral Financial Corp. v. US, the Court is requesting additional briefing by the parties on any impact the Admiral decision has on the pending summary judgment motions. Dft shall file a supplemental Brief by 11/1/2004, and Pltf shall file a Reply no later than 12/1/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Evans for USA. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Dft's Motion to Dismiss and REPLY BRIEF in Support of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [182] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum and Appendix in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Bancorp's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [182] Motion to Strike Memorandum. Plaintiff may file a reply within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [182] Pltf's MOTION to Strike [180] Dft's Supplemental Brief filed by USA. Reply due by 12/5/2003. Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [180] Dft's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Bancorp's Motion for Summary Judgment and Appendix to Dft's Supplemental Memorandum, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Dft's Supplemental Memorandum and Appendix, by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Service: 11/7/03. Response due by 11/24/2003. Response due by 11/24/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Response to the [179] October 9, 2003 Scheduling Order of This Court. Service: 10/31/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Dft's Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Bancorp's Motion for Summary Judgment, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by USA. Service: 10/31/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/14/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 9, 2003 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:The court has directed the parties to file their Supplemental Briefs by 10/31/2003. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams : Status Conference held on 10/9/2003. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 177 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The court will convene a Telephonic Status Conference on 10/9/2003 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. A court report will transcribe the proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: This is to clarify that the oral argument on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment on liability is scheduled for 2:00 pm, THURSDAY, October 9, 2003, at the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment on liability: Oral Argument set for Wednesday, 10/9/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. The proceedings will be transcribed. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Judge Marian Blank Horn no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 10, 2003 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/11/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for Thursday, 7/10/2003 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. McClain for UNITED STATES. Service: 6/24/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to the court's November 27, 2002 order. Service: 5/21/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 30, 2003 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Following the receipt of the defendant's May 21, 2003 filing, the court will schedule a status conference, at this time, further action on the cross-motions for summary judgment on liability are stayed. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/30/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marian Blank Horn : Status Conference held on 4/30/03. (mc1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/30/2003 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED OPINION DENYING [153] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) filed by FDIC. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [153] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) filed by FIRST ANNAPOLIS BANCORP, INC. Reply due 4/10/2003. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/27/03. (lrd )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [153] FDIC's Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) filed by The United States, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/14/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [156-1] motion to Strike the affidavit of Douglas A. Parran, Jr., [156-2] motion for Leave to Depose Douglas A. Parran. Service: 3/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FDIC to response to [153-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [150-1] order. Service: 2/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [152-3] order. Service: 2/28/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER returning Plaintiff's response to the motion for reconsideration (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 2/13/03) to [156-1] motion to Strike the affidavit of Douglas A. Parran, Jr. Reply due: 2/28/03. (LTD) Modified on 02/26/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/03 ) to Strike the affidavit of Douglas A. Parran, Jr. , or, in the alternative, for Leave to Depose Douglas A. Parran. Response due: 2/24/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS pursuant to [152-3] order. Service: 1/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Response to [153-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [150-1] order due 2/14/03 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 2/28/03 for [153-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [150-1] order (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service : 12/9/02 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [150-1] order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Plaintiff's Brief due 1/25/03 , and Defendant's reply brief due 2/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that the complaint if the plaintiff-intervenor is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding that there is no just reason for delay and directing the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) dismissing the compliant of FDIC. ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [65-1] motion to dismissCountes I, II and IV of FDIC's complaint. ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [147-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thelma Wanda Diaz for FDIC Added Ellis Merritt Jr. (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002, Terminated: 5/20/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/17/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thelma Wanda Diaz for FDIC Added Ellis Merritt Jr. . Response due: 6/3/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 20, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to [144-1] sur-reply by FDIC. Service: 2/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY by FDIC to defendant's supplemental reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on liability with regard to the FDIC filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 2/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to file FDIC's motion received on 2/12/02 and FDIC's sur-reply received on 2/13/02, which contains original signatures, and to return the 2/12/02 sur-reply; directing the filing of defendant's motion to strike, etc.; granting [141-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to defendant's supplemental reply; granting [142-2] motion for Leave to file a reply to the FDIC's sur-reply; and denying [142-1] motion to Strike [141-1] response by FDIC ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/14/02) to [141-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to defendant's supplemental reply filed [by leave of the judge]. (Included with motion to strike FDIC's response) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/02) to Strike [141-1] response by FDIC , opposition to FDIC's motion for leave to file sur-reply, and, in the alternative, for Leave to file a reply to the FDIC's sur-reply filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 2/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 2/11/02) for Leave to file sur-reply to defendant's supplemental reply filed [by leave of the judge]. (Included with response to motions for leave) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 2/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/11/02) to [137-1] and [139-1] motions for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of motion to dismiss the FDIC [and motion for leave to file sur-reply] filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [66-2] motion for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, IV. by USA ( Transcript due 3/22/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [22-1] cross motion by USA, [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FIRST ANNAPOLIS, [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FDIC, [49-1] cross motion by USA, [55-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages by FIRST ANNAPOLIS, [65-2] motion for summary judgment as to Count III by USA ( Transcript due 3/22/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [139-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of motion to dismiss the FDIC (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/7/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of motion to dismiss the FDIC . Response due: 2/25/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [137-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of its Motion to Dismiss the FDIC (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002, Terminated: 1/29/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/28/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of its Motion to Dismiss the FDIC . Response due: 2/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling oral argument at 2:30 p.m on 2/20/02 for [66-2] motion for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, IV, [65-2] motion for summary judgment as to Count III, [55-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages, [49-1] cross motion, [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [22-1] cross motion, and [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment . (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY by USA re: [49-1] cross motion by USA. Service: 7/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY by USA re: [22-1] cross motion by USA. Service: 7/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by FDIC re: [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FDIC, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [130-1] motion for Leave to file reply in support of supplemental motion for summary judgment on liability with regard to the (FDIC), granting [131-1] motion for Leave to file reply in support of supplemental motion for summary judgment on liability with regard to BANCORP ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/12/01) for Leave to file reply in support of supplemental motion for summary judgment on liability with regard to BANCORP . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 7/18/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/12/01) for Leave to file reply in support of supplemental motion for summary judgment on liability with regard to the (FDIC) . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST ANNAPOLIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (REPLY) RESPONSE by FDIC to [123-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [125-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation and ordering the Clerk's Office to file the supplemental reply (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [REPLY] RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to [122-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/28/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001, Terminated: 7/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service: 6/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 7/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix to Supplemental Memorandum in response to plaintiff's Bancorp's and FDIC's Supplemental briefs and in support of it's cross-motion for summary judgment on liability by USA. Service: 6/14/01. [two volumes] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA re: FDIC's Supplemental Brief and in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on liability. Service: 6/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA re: [119-1] memorandum by FIRST ANNAPOLIS. Service: 6/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 6/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 6/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Plaintiff's reply to defendant's supplemental memorandum due by 6/28/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER returning FDIC's Supplemental Brief for correction of defects (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM [Supplemental brief in support of its motion for entry of judgment on liability by FIRST ANNAPOLIS, together with a separate appendix of exhibits]. Service by hand: 5/14/01. Response by 6/14/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST ANNAPOLIS. Service: 5/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS, FDIC (Service: 4/6/01) to Extend Time to file supplemental briefs (to May 14, 2001 for plaintiffs to file supplemental briefs; to June 14, 2001 for defendant to respond, and to June 28, 2001 for plaintiffs to file replies) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing plaintiffs to file supplemental briefs by 5/14/01 ; defendant to respond by 6/14/01; and plaintiffs to reply by 6/28/01 . ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 26, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief deadline to 4/13/01 , Response to Supplemental Brief due: 5/14/01 for USA and Plaintiff's Reply to Response due: 5/29/01 for FIRST ANNAPOLIS (by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/28/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER rescheduling Status conference at 3:00 p.m. on 2/26/01. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [107-2] order. Service: 1/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. 2/5/01 , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS MEMORANDUM by FDIC Service: 1/12/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by FIRST ANNAPOLIS Service: 1/9/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [106-1] motion for Leave to File Facsimile Signature Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. 1/18/01 , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; Brief deadline to 1/16/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 1/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/00 ) for Leave to File Facsimile Signature. Response due: 1/8/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [64-1] motion to strike Plaintiff's 8/5/99 letter to the Chief Judge, granting [59-1] motion to Stay. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service : 12/1/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney John Wright Carlisle for FDIC Added Thelma Diaz. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: assignment. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/00) for Leave to file sur-reply to motion to suspend further expert discovery , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to response to [94-1] motion to suspend further expert discovery, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC to the Court's order dated March 27, 2000 (dealing with the summary judgment motons on liability pending in the First 30 cases and the selection of the first eight to go to trial). Service: 4/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/21/00) to [94-1] motion to suspend further expert discovery. Reply due: 4/3/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Stipulation by FIRST ANNAPOLIS, USA, FDIC. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [95-1] motion for Leave to File facsimile signatures. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000, Terminated: 3/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/00 ) for Leave to File facsimile signatures. Response due: 3/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 3/7/00 ) to suspend further expert discovery. Response due: 3/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY by FDIC re: Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss and for summary judgment. Service: 1/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [90-1] motion for Leave to file Surreply to Defendant's reply to response to motion to dismiss and for summary judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/24/00) to [90-1] motion for Leave to file Surreply to Defendant's reply to response to motion to dismiss and for summary judgment, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 2/18/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/6/00 ) for Leave to file Surreply to Defendant's reply to response to motion to dismiss and for summary judgment. Response due: 1/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 24, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [65-1] motion to dismissCounts I, II and IV of FDIC's complaint, [65-2] motion for summary judgment as to Count III. Service: 12/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [66-1] motion to dismiss Counts II, V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's complaint, [66-2] motion for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, IV. Service: 11/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [71-1] motion to exclude evidence, denying [62-1] motion for Leave to Take depositions out of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/27/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Initial List of Potential Liability Issues Remaining to be Decided by USA. Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 11/8/99 ) to [65-1] motion to dismissCountes I, II and IV of FDIC's complaint, [65-2] motion for summary judgment as to Count III. Reply due: 11/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 11/24/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/7/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 11/3/99 ) to [66-1] motion to dismiss Counts II, V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's complaint, [66-2] motion for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, IV. Reply due: 12/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: counsel may contact the court to schedule a hearing time re: motion for leave to take depositions out of time and related issues. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to response to [71-1] motion to exclude evidence. Service: 10/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/13/99 ) to [71-1] motion to exclude evidence. Reply due: 10/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to opposition to motion for leave to take deposition out of time and motion to exclude evidence. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 10/13/99 for [62-1] motion for Leave to depositions out of time. Defendant's response to [71-1] motion to exclude evidence reset to 10/13/99. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to FDIC's response to [62-1] motion for Leave to take depositions out of time. Service: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [59-1] motion to stay. Service: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion for Leave to Take depositions out of time. Service: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999, Terminated: 9/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/24/99) to Extend Time to file response to opposition to motion for leave to take deposition out of time and motion to exclude evidence , (until October 13, 1999). Response due: 10/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Plaintiff will oppose Defendant's motion for leave to take depositions out of time, so we cannot consider it further until Plaintiff has responded in writing. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to opposition to motion to stay briefing on motion for entry of partial summary judgmenton damages. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 9/27/99 for [59-1] motion to stay. ( by Acting Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/22/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 9/16/99) to [62-1] motion for Leave to Take depositions out of time. Reply due: 9/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999, Terminated: 11/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 9/16/99) to exclude evidence . Response due: 10/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 9/16/99 ) to [62-1] motion for Leave to Take depositions out of time. Reply due: 9/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [60-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999, Terminated: 9/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/13/99) to Extend Time to file response to opposition to motion to stay briefing on motion for entry of partial summary judgmenton damages , (until September 27, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 9/3/99 ) to [64-1] motion to strike Plaintiff's 8/5/99 letter to the Chief Judge. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 ) to dismiss Counts II, V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's complaint and for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, IV. Response due: 10/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 ) to dismissCountes I, II and IV of FDIC's complaint and for summary judgment as to Count III. Response due: 10/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999, Terminated: 12/15/2000 Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/31/99 ) to strike Plaintiff's 8/5/99 letter to the Chief Judge. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to response to [55-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages. Service: 9/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/3/99 ) for Leave to Take depositions out of time. Response due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 9/3/99 ) to [59-1] motion to stay. Reply due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/2/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/31/99) to Stay briefing on plaintiff's motion for entry of partial summary judgment on damages. Response due: 9/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 8/25/99 ) to [55-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [54-1] motion for Leave to take depositions (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST ANNAPOLIS Service: 8/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 8/5/99 ) for partial summary judgment on damages. Response due: 9/7/99 (JT) Modified on 08/06/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999, Terminated: 8/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/4/99) for Leave to take depositions , out of time. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Louis Anderson. Service : 1/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of supplemntal filing (pursuant to paragraph 5.d. of the OMNIBUS Case Management Order) by USA. Service: 7/30/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/30/98 ) to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 7/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 6/24/98 ) and RESPONSE to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FDIC or, in the alternative, Request for Discovery. Response due: 7/27/98 (JT) Modified on 06/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; response to [49-1] cross motion reset to 7/27/98. (JT) Modified on 06/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to [42-1] response by USA to memorandum in support of proposed order re: motion for summary judgment. Service: 6/5/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the Court's Order of 3/23/98, granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to FDIC's motion for partial summary judgment plaintiff to file its reply by 6/5/98 , Initial Response to [37-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 6/24/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to FDIC's motion for partial summary judgment , (until 23 days). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 6/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to the Court's Order of 3/23/98 [to June 5, 1998]. Response due: 6/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to 3/23/98 order, granting [29-1] motion for Leave to File Motion for Oral Argument on Sole Remaining Summary Judgment Issue, and denying [43-1] motion for Oral Argument on sole remaining summary judgment issue. Defendant's response to the court's March 23, 1998 order is due May 18, 1998 and set Plaintiff's reply deadline to Defendant's response to 6/2/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 2/17/98 ) for Oral Argument on sole remaining summary judgment issue. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [36-1] memorandum re: proposed order on motion for summary judgment by FIRST ANNAPOLIS FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/18/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998, Terminated: 5/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/98) to Extend Time to respond to 3/23/98 order until 5/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response pursuant to the court's March 23, 1998 Order. Defendant shall file response by 5/11/98 and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/26/98 for Plaintiff to file reply to Defendant's response. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file response pursuant to the court's March 23, 1998 Order , (until May 11, 1998). Response due: 5/18/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 4/22/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Daniel Frank Goldstein for FIRST ANNAPOLIS Added Dale Andrew Cooter. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service : 4/1/98 ) for Summary Judgment , together with a separate volume of appendix, FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 5/4/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by FIRST ANNAPOLIS in Support of Proposed Order. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Wells Newsom. Service : 3/27/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by FDIC Re: [33-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thelma Wanda Diaz for FDIC Added John Wright Carlisle. by FDIC Service 3/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service : 3/13/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thelma Wanda Diaz for FDIC Added John Wright Carlisle. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/6/98 ) to [29-1] motion for Leave to File Motion for Oral Argument on Sole Remaining Summary Judgment Issue. Reply due: 3/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 2/17/98 ) for Leave to File Motion for Oral Argument on Sole Remaining Summary Judgment Issue. Response due: 3/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [22-1] cross motion . Service: 1/5/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 1/13/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 11/21/97 ) to [22-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/7/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental filing pursuant to Paragraph 5.d. of the Omnibus Case Management Order filed by USA. Service: 10/1/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to October 1, 1997, to submit supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order and allowing plaintiff until 11/24/97 to file a response. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997, Terminated: 10/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/1/97 ) to Extend Time to October 1, 1997, to submit supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order Response due: 10/20/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 10/3/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 1/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 7/22/97 ) and RESPONSE to [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service : 5/23/97 ) for Partial Summary Judgment , on liability: the acquistion, etc. Response due: 6/23/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/28/97 Fee not required ( Answer due 5/30/97 ) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Richard Earle Rice (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, granting [10-2] motion for Leave to File status report and set Status Report deadline to 30 days prior to the expiration of the stay (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 2/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS (Service: 2/25/96) to [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/1/96) to Stay Proceedings (for 60 days), and for Leave to File status report (30 days prior to expiration of stay). Response due: 2/20/96 (FE) Modified on 02/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar case by U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 11/10/94 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994, Terminated: 10/11/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to November 10, 1994]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST ANNAPOLIS to [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar case by U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit. Service: 10/7/94. Reply due: 10/24/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994, Terminated: 10/28/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/21/94) to Stay pending decision in Winstar case by U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit . Response due: 10/11/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/22/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Earle Rice Service: 8/22/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of related cases [Nos. 92-707C et al.] by FIRST ANNAPOLIS filed. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37402. Answer due on 10/11/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?