COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00599-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo COMMERCIAL FEDERAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Ann Delaney
Office COFC
Filed 9/13/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 7/23/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (226) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 220 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003
JUDGMENT, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (bb1, )
    LREF
    Blank 219 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (bb1, )
      LREF
      Blank 218 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 6/18/03 by hand.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 217 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2003 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (dls, )
          LREF
          Blank 216 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER granting plaintiffs' request for an additional thirty days (until June 2, 2003) to assess the implications of the court's March 18, 2003 decision; denying defendant's request to enter judgment in favor of the government for both transactions; staying defendant's alternative request for a status conference; and directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 6/16/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (dls, )
            LREF
            Blank 215 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB., COMMERCIAL FEDERAL CORPORATION and The United States. (lrd)
              LREF
              Blank 214 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
              ORDER finding as moot [211] Motion for Leave to File notice of supplemental authority. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (lrd)
                LREF
                Blank 213 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part denying in part [105] Cross Motion filed by The United States and granting in part denying in part [59] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL CORPORATION, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Joint Status Report due 4/14/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (lrd)
                  LREF
                  Blank 212 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to Motion, re [211] Motion for Leave to File supplemental authority, filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 3/31/2003. Service: 3/17/03. (lrd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 211 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/6/03) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 3/24/03. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 210 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of supplemental authority by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 2/13/03. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 209 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [207-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 208 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                          RESPONSE by USA to [206-1] notice by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 3/3/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 207 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 2/13/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 3/3/03. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 206 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 10/28/02 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 205 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [195-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority, denying [203-1] motion to Strike [199-1] notice of supplemental authority by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 204 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                  RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 11/19/02) to [203-1] motion to Strike [199-1] notice of supplemental authority by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Reply due: 12/6/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 203 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/14/02) to Strike [199-1] notice of supplemental authority by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL . Response due: 12/2/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 202 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Response
                                      RESPONSE by USA to [192-1] notice by COMMERCIAL BANK and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 11/18/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 201 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying [196-1] motion to Strike; Defendant's alternative request to respond to plaintiff's supplemental submission filed on 10/21/02, is GRANTED Defendant shall respond to supplemental submission by 11/18/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 200 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                          RESPONSE by USA to [191-1] notice by COMMERCIAL BANK and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/30/02. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 199 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of supplemental authority by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 10/8/02. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 198 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [188-1] motion for Leave to file the accompanying notice of supplemental authority ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 197 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/25/02 ) to [188-1] motion for Leave to file the accompanying notice of supplemental authority, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/12/02. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002, Terminated: 11/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/30/02) to Strike Plaintiff's supplemental submission, re: its contract documents. Response due: 11/18/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 10/28/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 11/14/02. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                      RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [189-1] order. Service: 10/18/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [184-1] response by COMMERCIAL BANK and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/11/02. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 192 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION re: contract documents by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/02. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 191 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: on the authority of FHLBB principal supervisory agents to enter into WINSTAR-RELATED Contracts by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/02. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                              APPENDIX OF EXHIBIT'S by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK re: Contract Documents, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/02. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion for extension filed 10/24/94, denying as moot Plaintiffs' request for a status conference filed 10/28/94, granting Defendant's motion for leave to file notice filed 3/20/96, denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file letter filed 04/11/96, denying as moot Defendant's motion for partial modification of protective order filed 04/18/96, denying as moot Defendant's motion for leave to file motion filed 04/26/96, denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response filed 05/08/96, denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion for setting of status conference filed 07/11/96, denying as moot Defendant's motion for leave to file motion filed 07/25/96, denying as moot Defendant's motion for leave to file proposed pretrial order filed 08/16/96, denying as moot Defendant's motion for continuance filed 05/14/98, denying as moot Plaintiffs' motion for enlargement of page numbers filed 11/03/99, and denying as moot Defendant's motion for leave to file a surreply filed 03/01/00. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002, Terminated: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 10/8/02) for Leave to file the accompanying notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 10/25/02. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 186 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Transcript
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 30, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER re: Plaintiff is directed to file a supplemental Brief by deadline of 10/15/02; Defendant shall file reply by 10/28/02 . Plaintiff shall file a notice specifically delineating the sections of the relevant documents, etc., by 10/15/02 ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Response
                                                                        RESPONSE and Notice of Additional Supplemental Authority by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 9/24/02 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [180-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority, granting [182-1] motion for Leave to file response to Defendant's motion for leave of file notice of supplemental authority and Plaintiff's notice of supplemental authority. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 185 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ERRATA - "The court's September 23, 2002, paragraph (1)(a) should read as follows: Defendant;s Notice of Filing of Motion for Leave to File Supplement Authority with the Court filed August 17, 1998 is GRANTED; and" ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 182 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 9/24/02) for Leave to file response to Defendant's motion for leave of file notice of supplemental authority and Plaintiff's notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 10/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [180-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority, granting [178-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of recent authority: Fifth Third and Hegewisch (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 9/17/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 10/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/24/02 ) to [178-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of recent authority: Fifth Third and Hegewisch Reply due: 8/6/02 (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 178 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 7/17/02) for Leave to notify the court of recent authority: Fifth Third and Hegewisch . Response due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 177 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 9/30/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/26/02. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties Status report due 6/28/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK re: addressing the impact of the Federal Circuit's Calfed decision on this case. Service: 5/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Response
                                                                                                RESPONSE (supplemental brief) by USA pursuant to [171-2] order. Service: 5/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                  JOINT MEMORANDUM by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK, and USA summarizing background and procedural history of the case. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying [170-1] motion for a status conference, denying [167-1] motion for a status conference, granting [165-1] motion for Oral Argument on cross-motion for summary judgment, denying [163-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16, granting [158-1] motion to supplement the record with two brief document's, denying [157-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16, denying [152-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16 Parties' joint memorandum, supplemental briefs, not to exceed 20 pages, and joint status report due 5/14/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 170 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 4/12/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/18/02) for a status conference Response due: 2/4/02. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT AND MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE). (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 4/12/2002
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL BANK to [167-1] motion for a status conference by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and [167-1] status report by COMMERCIAL BANK, COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 1/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [168-1] motion for Leave to file out of time (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/18/02) for Leave to file out of time (enlargement within which to respond to 12/18/01 request for a status conference until 1/4/02). (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 12/18/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/7/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 12/18/01. [1 of 2 parts] (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 7/13/01) to [165-1] motion for Oral Argument on cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 7/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [163-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Service: 7/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 6/29/01) for Oral Argument on cross-motion for summary judgment and motion to preclude Comfed's introduction of new opinions from its expert-designee. Response due: 7/16/01. (LTD) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/29/01) to [163-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Reply due: 7/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          SECOND MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 6/19/01) for scheduling conference under Rule 16 . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [156-1] motion to preclude COMFED'S introduction of new opinion's from it's expert-designee. Service by hand: 5/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Maureen Ann Delaney Service: 4/24/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service by hand: 4/23/01) to [156-1] motion to preclude COMFED'S introduction of new opinion's from it's expert-designee. Reply due: 5/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [157-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Service: 4/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/01) to supplement the record with two brief document's . Response due: 4/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/11/01) to [157-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Reply due: 4/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        RENEWED MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service by hand: 4/6/01) for scheduling conference under Rule 16 . Response due: 4/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/6/01) to preclude COMFED'S introduction of new opinion's from it's expert-designee . Response due: 4/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Susan F. LaMarca Service: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [152-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Service: 1/9/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/5/01) to [152-1] motion for scheduling conference under Rule 16. Reply due: 1/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001, Terminated: 4/12/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 1/2/01) for scheduling conference under Rule 16 . Response due: 1/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [129-1] motion for Sanctions (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED ORDER re: deposition of Plaintiffs' expert. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Stipulated Order by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: assignment. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/1/00 (by hand)) to [145-1] motion for Clarification. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 10/31/00 ) for Clarification. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: the deposition of Mr. Simmons. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY ON LIABILITY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [128-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on liability. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [137-1] motion for Leave to File a surreply to the motion for sanctions. Service: 3/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/19/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 3/15/00 (by hand)) to [137-1] motion for Leave to File a surreply to the motion for sanctions. Reply due: 3/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [128-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on liability. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/3/00 (JT) Modified on 03/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [135-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for leave to file a surreply on liability. Plaintiffs' reply to response to motion reset to 3/3/00 for [128-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on liability. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a surreply to the motion for sanctions. (surreply attached) Response due: 3/15/00 (JT) Modified on 03/03/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [130-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motions for leave to file surreply, surreply and motions sanctions, granting nunc pro tunc [132-1] motion to Extend Time to to Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file surreply on liability and surreply on liability. ( signed by Chief Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000, Terminated: 3/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 2/28/00) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for leave to file a surreply on liability until 03/03/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [129-1] motion for Sanctions. Service: 2/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/11/00 ) to [128-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on liability. Reply due: 2/28/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/7/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file surreply on liability and surreply on liability [until February 11, 2000]. Response due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/7/00 ) to [129-1] motion for Sanctions. Reply due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000, Terminated: 2/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/28/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to respond to motions for leave to file surreply, surreply and motions for sanctions [until February 7, 2000]. Response due: 2/11/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000, Terminated: 12/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service by hand: 1/14/00) for Sanctions . Response due: 1/28/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000, Terminated: 6/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service by hand: 1/14/00 ) for Leave to file a surreply on liability . Response due: 1/28/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [105-1] cross motion. Service: 12/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by USA re: [106-1] statement by USA. Service: 12/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [124-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrected Copy - Supplemental Appendix of Exhibits (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected Copy - Plaintiff's Reply to Response to motion for partial summary judgment and response to Defendant's cross-motion. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected Copy - Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues and Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [118-1] motion for Leave to file corrected versions of 11/3/99 filings. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999, Terminated: 1/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/6/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to [115-1] notice by USA. Service: 12/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999, Terminated: 12/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service by hand: 11/24/99) for Leave to file corrected versions of 11/3/99 filings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [116-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to cross-motion. Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/6/99 for [105-1] cross motion, reset to 12/6/99 for [105-1] motion to dismiss counts two through eight of Plaintiffs' complaint. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999, Terminated: 11/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/19/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time to reply to response to cross-motion [until December 6, 1999]. Response due: 12/3/99 (JT) Modified on 11/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Initial List of Potential Liability Issues Remaining to be Decided by USA. Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 11/3/99 (by hand)) to [105-1] cross motion, [105-1] motion to dismiss counts two through eight of Plaintiffs' complaint. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 10/29/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pre-Trial Stipulation and Order by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 10/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [109-1] motion to compel , denying [101-1] motion to compel , denying [50-1] motion to compel. Defendant's time for filing its expert reports will begin running when Plaintiffs' supporting documents are received. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999, Terminated: 9/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 9/23/99 ) to compel Defendant's compliance with discovery plan and for expedited consideration of this motion. Response due: 10/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [104-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 9/14/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 09/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 9/14/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 9/14/99 (by hand)) and RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 10/12/99 (motion to dismiss included) FILED UNDER SEAL ( Response due 10/12/99 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 (by hand)) to dismiss counts two through eight of Plaintiffs' complaint. Response due: 10/12/99 (cross-motion included) FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/2/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [101-1] motion to compel further responses to interrogatories relating to damages: Nos. 7,8,10,22-26,45,46,64-67 and 73, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/10/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 7/27/99 ) to [101-1] motion to compel further responses to interrogatories relating to damages: Nos. 7,8,10,22-26,45,46,64-67 and 73. Reply due: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/13/99 (by hand)) to compel further responses to interrogatories relating to damages: Nos. 7,8,10,22-26,45,46,64-67 and 73. Response due: 7/27/99 (JT) Modified on 07/14/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [94-1] order. Service by hand: 4/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [91-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of Defendant's responses to Plaintiffs' first set of requests for admission. Request for admission No. 35 is deemed admitted. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/15/99 for Plaintiff to re-serve any remaining requests for admission. Set Defendant's answer to each such request due 4/30/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [91-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of Defendant's responses to Plaintiffs' first set of requests for admission. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/24/99) to [91-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of Defendant's responses to Plaintiffs' first set of requests for admission. (filed with one (1) appendix) Reply due: 4/5/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot [93-1] motion for Leave to File a surreply to Plaintiffs' reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents insofar as by April 16, 1999, Defendant shall complete its document searches and produce to Plaintiffs all responsive documents pertaining to the 1984-88 meetings called for by paragraphs 29 and 30 of Plaintiffs' 4/1/88 document request, as well as responsive documents from the Washington, DC offices of the Federal Home Loan Bank Board and the Office of Thrift Supervision. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 3/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/99 ) for Leave to File a surreply to Plaintiffs' reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents. Response due: 4/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to response to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Service: 3/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999, Terminated: 4/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 3/10/99 (by hand)) to determine the sufficiency of Defendant's responses to Plaintiffs' first set of requests for admission. Response due: 3/24/99 (JT) Modified on 03/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/9/99 ) to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Reply due: 3/22/99 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [88-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to First Phase II case -specific interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 3/16/99 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999, Terminated: 3/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 2/26/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to First Phase II case -specific interrogatories , (until March 16, 1999). Response due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [85-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents Response to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents reset to 3/9/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 2/22/99 ) to [85-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents. Reply due: 3/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999, Terminated: 2/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/16/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents [until March 9, 1999]. Response due: 3/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first phase II case-specific interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 3/2/99 (signed by Acting Chief Judge Robert H. Hodges for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999, Terminated: 2/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 2/5/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first phase II case-specific interrogatories [until March 2, 1999]. Response due: 2/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [81-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel production of documents Response to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents reset to 2/16/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999, Terminated: 1/26/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/25/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel production of documents , (until February 16, 1999) by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [79-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to First Phase II Case-specific interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 2/9/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999, Terminated: 1/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 1/19/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to First Phase II Case-specific interrogatories , (until February 9, 1999). Response due: 2/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [77-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to motion to compel production of documents Response to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents reset to 1/25/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999, Terminated: 1/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand : 1/4/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to motion to compel production of documents , (until January 25, 1999). Response due: 2/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel production of documents. Defendant's response to [74-1] motion to Compel production of documents reset to 12/31/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999, Terminated: 1/4/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand : 12/21/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel production of documents , (until 12/31/98), filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998, Terminated: 3/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service by hand: 12/8/98) to Compel production of documents . Response due: 12/22/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to requests for interrogatories and admissions. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first set of interrogatories and requests for admissions deadline to 12/24/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998, Terminated: 12/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to requests for interrogatories and admissions , (until December 24, 1998). Response due: 1/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [64-1] motion for Leave to file out of time reply in support of motion for continuance. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/9/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [65-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to requests for admissions and interrogatories, granting [65-2] motion to permit Defendant to file a status report by 10/9/98. Set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 10/9/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service by hand: 8/20/98 ) to [64-1] motion for Leave to file out of time reply in support of motion for continuance. Reply due: 8/31/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/17/98 ) for Leave to file upplemental authority with the Court . Response due: 9/3/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/17/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to requests for admissions and interrogatories , (until 30 days from date plaintiffs complete production of documents, etc.) and to permit Defendant to file a status report by 10/9/98 . 11/14/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998, Terminated: 11/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/3/98 ) for Leave to file out of time reply in support of motion for continuance Response due: 8/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 6/1/98 ) to [62-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 6/15/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF COUNSEL by USA. Service 5/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/14/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [after discovery has been completed]. Response due: 6/1/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Renee Brooker Service : 4/3/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK, filed Under Seal, with redacted version. Service: 3/25/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 3/25/98 ) for Summary Judgment on the liability for breach of contract , together with separate appendix and filed Under Seal, (redacted copy also submitted). Response due: 4/27/98. (HW) Modified on 03/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melida Narcisa Hodgson. Service: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/23/96) to [52-1] motion for setting of status conference and entry of case management and protective orders and [50-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 8/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER reset Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 7/11/96 ) for setting of status conference and entry of case management and protective orders . Response due: 7/29/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 7/8/96 ) to Compel completion of outstanding discovery. Response due: 7/25/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Thomas David Dinackus (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL to [46-2] order. Service: 6/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [45-1] motion for Leave to File status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/96 ) for Leave to File status report (status report included in motion). Response due: 5/24/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [39-1] motion for partial modification of protective order. Service: 5/20/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas David Dinackus Service : 5/10/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service:5/6/96) to defendant's [39-1] motion for partial modification of protective order. Reply due: 5/23/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/96) for partial modification of protective order . Response due: 5/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK (Service: 4/11/96) for Leave to File letter dated April 9, 1996 . Response due: 4/29/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [35-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges.) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [28-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the parties to review the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from parties on this point (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL and COMMERCIAL BANK. Service: 11/30/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [24-1] order Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER the United States has decided to seek certiorari in the Winstar case which could take well into next year. The court will entertain suggestions concerning whether the court should await a decision, and if so, how the time between now and then could be used productively, if at all. Parties are to advise no later than 11/30/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court enters decision in Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Staying proceedings pending en banc opinion from the Federal Circuit in Winstar (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/31/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995, Terminated: 1/26/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 1/23/95) to Extend Time to file joint preliminary status report [to January 31, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of requests for production of documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/9/94 ( JPSR due 1/26/95 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of requests for production of documents and reset Request for Production of Documents deadline to 12/29/94 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994, Terminated: 12/9/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of requests for production of documents , (until December 29, 1994). Response due: 12/27/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/12/94 ( signed by the Clerk) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994, Terminated: 11/10/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to December 12, 1994]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dean Lawrence Grayson Service : 11/2/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER if parties cannot agree to stipulation, they should exchange documents in accordance with 10/14/94 order ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/7/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK (Service : 10/28/94 ) for a status conference Response due: 11/14/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/7/1994 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL, COMMERCIAL BANK to [6-2] order Service: 10/28/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/7/1994 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [6-2] order dtd 10/6/94. Service: 10/28/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 10/17/94) to Extend Time to respond to motion for a stay of proceedings [to October 30, 1994] by leave of Judge. (FE) Modified on 10/31/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision in U.S. Court of Appeals [if parties can stipulate that C.A.F.C.'s decision in Winstar will control this case, it is agreed that this case should be suspended pending decision and set Notice of Compliance [parties to notify court if they can enter into a stipulation by 10/31/94 ; if parties can't stipulate, discovery is open for a period not to exceed six months (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/01/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994, Terminated: 10/6/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/29/94) to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision in U.S. Court of Appeals . Response due: 10/17/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/30/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Discovery deadline to 3/24/95, if needed and set dispositive Motions Filing deadline to 4/24/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/23/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Earle Rice Service: 9/19/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/14/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/14/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37562. Answer due on 11/14/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?