LAC FACILITIES, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00604-KRH
District Judge Kenneth R. Harkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LAC FACILITIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loyd M. Starrett +1 617 457 3100
No Logo LITTLE ARCH CREEK PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loyd M. Starrett +1 617 457 3100
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/14/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/23/1998
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
194-cv-00604-KRH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 74 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/28/98 for parties jointly to file a recommended schedule for pretrial preparation if these cases are not dismissed by August 14, 1998 ( Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
        LREF
        Blank 73 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 72 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER extending the current suspension to June 15, 1998 , set Status Report deadline for each of the parties to 6/30/98 ( Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank 71 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 70 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 4/30/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 69 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998 Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: 3/16/98 (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER case remains suspended. set Status Report deadline to 3/16/98. ( Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 68 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 Status Report
                    Joint STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 66 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 1/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER continuing suspension of proceedings , and directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 1/29/98 . ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 65 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 64 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: 10/30/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER Continuing stay of proceedings , and the parties shall file a joint Status Report by 10/30/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: 9/16/97 (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: 7/31/97 (CDC)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 9/15/97 (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 60 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Status Report
                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK Service: 6/16/97 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 59 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 58 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to file status report reset Status Report deadline to 5/5/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 4/14/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997, Terminated: 4/18/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC. and LITTLE ARCH CREEK (Service : 4/11/97 ) to Extend Time to file status report , [until 5/5/97]. (AB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 57 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC., LITTLE ARCH CREEK (Service : 4/7/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert C. Cadle for LAC FACILITIES, INC. Added Loyd M. Starrett . (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 55 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER re: continuing Stay of proceedings , and parties shall file a Joint Status Report by deadline of 4/14/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 54 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER filing a joint status report by leave of the Judge (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 4/21/97 [45 days]. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 11/4/96 [45 days]. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA, LITTLE ARCH CREEK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/29/96 (FE) Modified on 08/05/1996
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [45-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 7/1/96 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  RESPONSE by LITTLE ARCH CREEK (Service: 6/14/96 ) to [45-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 7/1/96 (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Status Report
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/13/96. (HW) Modified on 06/18/1996
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                      Consolidated Lead Case. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        SEE 96-159T FOR MOTION by USA (Service: 5/16/96) to Dismiss. Response due: 6/17/96 (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Status Report
                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 6/13/96 [45 days]. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 Remark
                                                                              *** See 96-159T for motion to consolidate cases. *** (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Order
                                                                                ORDER granting [42-1] joint motion to Stay Proceedings, set Status Report deadline to 4/29/96 and every 45 days thereafter (signed by Senior Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996, Terminated: 3/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC., USA to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests, granting [40-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery, reset Interrogatories deadline to 3/13/96 and reset Discovery deadline to 4/12/96 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/23/1996
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 2/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/96) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to March 13, 1996] and to Extend Time to complete discovery [to April 12, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Robert C. Cadle (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to file discovery requests, granting [37-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery, reset Interrogatories deadline to 1/29/96 and reset Discovery deadline to 2/27/96 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995, Terminated: 12/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) to Extend Time to file discovery requests [to January 28, 1996] and to Extend Time to complete discovery [to February 27, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Second request for Admissions, granting [35-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery resetting the request for admissions deadline to 12/29/95 and resetting Discovery deadline to 1/29/96 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995, Terminated: 11/30/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/29/95) to Extend Time to respond to Second request for Admissions until 12/29/95, and to Extend Time to complete discovery until 1/28/96. Response due: 12/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery reset Discovery deadline to 12/29/95 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995, Terminated: 10/31/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION (Service : 10/27/95) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 12/29/95. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER directing parties to file joint status report ; set Status Report deadline to 8/18/95 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests and reset Interrogatories deadline to 8/25/95 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995, Terminated: 8/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC. (Service: 8/9/95) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to August 25, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER entered granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's first request for admissions Request for Production of Documents deadline to 7/19/95 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995, Terminated: 6/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/19/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's first request for admissions (to July 19, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery, set Plaintiff's Interrogatories deadline to 8/11/95 and reset Discovery deadline to 10/30/95 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995, Terminated: 6/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC. (Service: 6/7/95) to Extend Time for discovery [to October 30, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER entered granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery ; all Discovery completed by 8/31/95 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/15/95 ) to [23-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995, Terminated: 5/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC. (Service: 5/12/95) to Extend Time to complete discovery [to August 31, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER entered directing all Discovery competed by 5/15/95 ; any dispositive motion shall be filed 30 days after close of discovery; if no dispositive motion is filed, 30 days after close of discovery, a joint recommendation for further proceedings shall be filed (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [19-1] response by LAC FACILITIES, INC. re: paragraph 1 of 2/1/95 order. Service: 3/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [18-1] response by LAC FACILITIES, INC. Service: 3/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LAC FACILITIES, INC. to [15-1] response by USA Service: 3/1/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LAC FACILITIES, INC. to [13-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 3/1/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by LAC FACILITIES, INC. re: [12-3] order by leave of Judge. Service: 2/14/95. Response due: 3/1/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; set Defendant's Notice of Compliance [response to Plaintiff's brief re: paragraph 3] deadline to 3/1/95 (FE) Modified on 02/21/1995
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        Statement by LAC FACILITIES, INC. to [12-3] order Service: 2/14/95. Response due 2/27/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          Statement by USA to [12-3] order with response by March 2, 1995. Service: 2/15/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by USA re: paragraph 3 of [12-3] order. Service: 2/15/95. Plaintiff's response due 2/27/95. (FE) Modified on 02/21/1995
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; set Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance [response to memorandum] deadline to 2/27/95 . (FE) Modified on 02/21/1995
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance [parties' statements re: procedures established in items 1-3 in Animal Protection Institute v. U.S.] deadline to 2/15/95 [each party may file a response within 10 days of service], set parties' Brief deadline to 2/15/95 [response within 10 days of service] and DENYING Plaintiff's request for assignment of a settlement judge (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/28/1994, Entered: 1/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint preliminary status report resetting date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/30/95 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994, Terminated: 12/28/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/22/94) to Extend Time to file a joint preliminary status report [to January 28, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Answer
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/14/94. (JPSR due 1/1/95). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [2-1] motion to Impound Papers Pending Resolution of Related Tax Court Proceedings ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [2-1] motion to Impound Papers Pending Resolution of Related Tax Court Proceedings Service: 9/28/94. Reply due: 10/11/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of related case [93-325T] by USA Service: 9/19/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service : 9/19/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994, Terminated: 10/19/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by LAC FACILITIES, INC. (Service: 9/14/94) to Impound Papers Pending Resolution of Related Tax Court Proceedings filed. Response due: 9/28/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37587. Answer due on 11/14/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?