GATES COMMUNITY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00606-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GATES COMMUNITY CHAPEL OF ROCHESTER, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Stewart Gray +1 216 891 4141
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Gustafson David.D.Gustafson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/15/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/6/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GATES COMMUNITY and USA without prejudice. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to discovery requests and reset Interrogatories deadline to 5/6/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996, Terminated: 4/2/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
        MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 3/20/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to discovery requests , (until May 6, 1996), by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/8/96. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to file Answers to Defendant's Interrogatories and set Interrogatories deadline to 3/6/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996, Terminated: 2/12/1996 Terminated:
            MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 2/2/96) to Extend Time to file Answers to Defendant's Interrogatories until 3/6/96. Response due: 2/20/96 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER set Discovery deadline to 6/24/96 and set Status Report deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Zachary Stewart Gray. See 1/17/96 joint status report. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                    UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment and set Status Report deadline to 1/17/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT by GATES COMMUNITY by leave of Judge. Service: 8/14/95 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                        STATUS REPORT by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 8/16/95 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/28/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Individual Status reports due on 8/15/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copies to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER entered granting [25-1] motion to Stay proceedings until May 26, 1995 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995, Terminated: 5/5/1995 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                              MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 4/26/95) to Stay proceedings filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/15/95 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Court Filing
                                ORDER entered directing the filing of plaintiff's motion for suspension of proceedings etc. and directing the Clerk to change the address of plaintiff's attorney. (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply to motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/26/95 for [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/12/1995, Terminated: 4/13/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 4/6/95) to Extend Time to file a reply to motion for partial summary judgment (to April 26, 1995). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/28/95 ) to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment Reply due: 4/14/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA Service: 3/28/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER entered granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment reset Response to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 3/28/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995, Terminated: 3/14/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/95 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment (to March 28, 1995). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GATES COMMUNITY Service: 2/17/95 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GATES COMMUNITY in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Service: 2/11/95 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER entered that plaintiff's submission recieved on 2/14/95 is allowed filed considering the following defects: untimely, does not comply with Rule 83. Plaintiff's motion for enlargement is returned unfile due to duplicate. The indext, referred in 2/15/95 order is still required to be filed by 2/18/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 2/11/95 ) for Summary Judgment and brief in support of motion Response due: 3/14/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER entered allowing plaintiff's submission filed even thou it had the following defects: untimely [due 2/10/95]; and Rules 56(d) and 83,1(a)(1)(G) , directing plaintiff to file proposed findings of fact and index to the appendix by 2/28/95 . The time for defendant to file a response to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment will run from the date of service of the proposed findings of fact and the index (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motions and reset Motion Filing deadline to 2/10/95 [motions to be filed seriatim and not concurrently] (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service: 1/24/95) to Extend Time to file dispositive motions [to February 10, 1995]. (FE) Modified on 02/03/1995
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File substitute report ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 1/10/1995 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/95) for Leave to File substitute report . Response due: 1/23/95 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER entered directing the parties that if any Dispositive Motion Filing should be filed by 1/30/95 , if no dispositive motions are filed then discovery will continue until 4/30/95 (signed by Judge Robert Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/29/1994, Entered: 1/4/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by GATES COMMUNITY (Service : 11/28/94 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Richard Edward Connell for GATES COMMUNITY Added Zachary Stewart Gray. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Answer
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 11/14/94 (JPSR due 1/1/95). (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/21/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Douglas Gustafson. Service : 9/19/94. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37589. Answer due on 11/14/94. (FE)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?