MACO BANCORP, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00625-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 8:51 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MACO BANCORP, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M. Wolff +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 pwolff@wc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliff & Berridge, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Earle Rice +1 703 836 6400 +1 703 836 2787 rrice@oliff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George Cole
Space David Alan Levitt +1 202 307 0309 david.levitt@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Jeffreys Roessner +1 202 514 7300
Office COFC
Filed 9/23/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $50000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/4/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 122 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER directing sealed documents be returned to parties (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 121 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001
    JOINT STATUS REPORT by MACO BANCORP, INC. AND USA. Service: 3/2/01. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 120 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Joint Status Report deadline to 3/2/01 , or show cause why the listed documents should remain under seal ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 119 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated November 4, 1999, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 118 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $1,000,000.00, with each party to bear its own attorney fees, costs and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 117 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Court Filing
            ORDER adopting the terms of the stipulation and orders, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment be entered against the U.S. in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $1,000,000.00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999
              Case closed (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 116 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999
                Stipulation by MACO BANCORP, INC., USA for entry of judgment. (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 115 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/5/1999 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/1/99. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 114 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [109-1] motion for Leave to File with the managing judge of the Winstar-Related Cases a motion for the managing judge to retain jurisdiction over this case or for alternative relief, denying [110-1] motion to schedule a hearing on Maco's motion for clarification filed with the managing judge. The clerk is ordered to return the 9/2/99 motion to Plaintiff. Defendant's response to the motion for retention, filed 9/16/99, also shall be returned as moot. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/28/1999
                      LREF
                      Blank 113 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Exhibit
                      Trial Exhibit List (revised) by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service by hand: 9/17/99. (FE) Modified on 09/22/1999
                        LREF
                        Blank 112 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set status conference for 2:00 p.m., 9/21/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 111 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/16/99 ) to [109-1] motion for Leave to File with the managing judge of the Winstar-Related Cases a motion for the managing judge to retain jurisdiction over this case or for alternative relief. Reply due: 9/27/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 110 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Terminated:
                            MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 9/9/99 (by hand)) to schedule a hearing on Maco's motion for clarification filed with the managing judge , and to accelerate briefing and hearing on Maco's motion for the managing judge to retain jurisdiction over this case, or for alternative relief. Response due: 9/23/99 (JT) Modified on 09/14/1999
                              LREF
                              Blank 109 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999, Terminated: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                              MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 9/2/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File with the managing judge of the Winstar-Related Cases a motion for the managing judge to retain jurisdiction over this case or for alternative relief (motion included) and requesting oral argument at the 9/8/99 Winstar Case status conference. Response due: 9/16/99 (JT) Modified on 09/03/1999
                                LREF
                                Blank 108 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Witness List
                                Witness list by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 107 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of witness testimony by USA. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 106 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 10/8/99 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 105 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Transcript
                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 16, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 104 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [100-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 103 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Witness List
                                          Witness list by USA. Service: 8/25/99 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 102 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Exhibit
                                            Exhibit list by USA. Service: 8/25/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 101 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                              MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. Service: 8/25/99 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 100 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999, Terminated: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/24/99) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial and for Expedited Consideration . Response due: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting Defendant's request to depose Plaintiff's rebuttal witnesses, granting Defendant's request for reservation of the opportunity for entry of a motion in limine on the ground that these rebuttal witnesses' reports address new topics, denying [96-1] motion to compel Defendant's Appendix G pretrial filing. Set Defendant's Appendix G deadline on 8/25/99 ; set the parties briefs re: witness' testimony deadline to 8/30/99 ; set motions in limine, evidentiary objections and other objections reasonably foreseeable in advance of trial filing deadline to 10/4/99 ; set the parties responses to the objectiions to 10/8/99 ; set pretrial conference for 2:00 p.m., 10/13/99 ; set binder(s) of exhibits due 10/4/99 ; and set trial, to be held for 10 days, for 9:00 a.m., 10/25/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties.(JT) Modified on 08/20/1999
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                    Pre-Trial Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 10/13/99 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [65-1] motion for summary judgment on Maco's damage claim and response to cross-motion. (reply to response to cross-motion due 8/30/99) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/13/99 (JT) Modified on 08/24/1999
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER filing by leave Defendant's reply to response to motion for summary judgment and response to cross-motion for summary judgment.( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                          Deadline updated; set Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response to cross-motion deadline to 8/30/99. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Status Conference
                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/15/99 ) (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 8/19/1999 Motion to Compel
                                                              MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 8/13/99 (by hand)) to compel Defendant's appendix G pretrial filing, including its memorandum of contentions of fact and law, witness list and exhibit list. Response due: 8/27/99 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999
                                                                REPLY by MACO BANCORP, INC. to response to [73-1] motion for clarification concerning the Court's July 22, 1999 Opinion and Order. Service: 8/13/99 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 11/4/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                  REVISED RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 8/9/99 ) to [65-1] motion for summary judgment on Maco's damage claim. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999
                                                                    Revised Pretrial Brief by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999
                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [88-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/12/99 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 11/4/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/12/99 (by hand)) to [73-1] motion for clarification concerning the Court's July 22, 1999 Opinion and Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/9/99 (cross-motion included) (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 11/4/1999 Cross MotionCourt Filing
                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 8/12/99 (by hand)) and RESPONSE to [73-2] motion for summary judgment on Defendant's counterclaim by MACO BANCORP, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/9/99 (response to motion included) (JT) Modified on 08/13/1999
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999, Terminated: 8/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 8/9/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (appendix exceeding 50 pages) (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  REPLY by MACO BANCORP, INC. to response to [67-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages. Service: 8/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER mooting [58-1] motion for the issuance of an order of assignment, filing by leave and denying [84-1] motion to designate deposition testimony of Government expert witnesses Robert Hall, William Hamm, and Thomas Randlett, filing by leave and denying [85-1] motion to designate deposition testimony of Frank Pavlic and J. Wiliam Middendorf, II. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/12/99 for Defendant's opposition, if any to the terms of Plaintiff's motion for clarification. The Clerk's Office is directed to return the following because of defects: Plaintiff's Appendix G memorandum and addendum (unbound & exceeds the 40 page limit), Plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed the page limit (certificate of service & untimely) and Plaintiff's objections to Defendant proposed findings (Plaintiff may file a statement of genuine issues). The current trial schedule is vacated. Set scheduling/status conference for 2:00 p.m., 8/16/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                      MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 7/29/99 (by hand)) to designate deposition testimony of Frank Pavlic and J. Wiliam Middendorf, II. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                        MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 7/29/99 (by hand)) to designate deposition testimony of Government expert witnesses Robert Hall, William Hamm, and Thomas Randlett. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                          Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 8/16/99 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of filing "Maco Bancorp, Inc.'s Reply To Government's Surreply Concerning The Assignment Of This Case" by MACO BANCORP, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 7/30/99 ) and RESPONSE to [67-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damages by MACO BANCORP, INC. Response due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Remark
                                                                                                RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. to proposed findings by USA. [Returned pursuant to court's order of 8/4/99.] (LD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] motion for the issuance of an order of assignment pursuant to which a trial judge would be assigned, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to file supplmental reply to plaintiff's supplemental response to motion for an order of assignment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Deadline updated; response to [83-1] cross motion reset to 8/30/99. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                        Exhibit list by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                          Witness list by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999, Terminated: 11/4/1999 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                              MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 7/28/99 ) for clarification concerning the Court's July 22, 1999 Opinion and Order or, alternatively, for summary judgment on Defendant's counterclaim. Response due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                  [Sur] Reply by MACO BANCORP, INC. to defendant's response [surreply] to plaintiff's reply in support of [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 7/16/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [35-1] cross motion, granting [52-1] motion for Leave to reply to any surreply by the United States, denying [52-1] motion to Strike any surreply to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, granting [53-1] motion for Leave to file Counterclaim; and reassigning this case to Senior Judge Yock with the exception of any motions for clarification of this opinion. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      IDENTIFICATION OF REBUTTAL EXPERTS by MACO BANCORP, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999, Terminated: 7/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/16/99) for Leave to file supplmental reply to plaintiff's supplemental response to motion for an order of assignment . Response due: 8/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                          MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 7/2/99 (by hand)) for partial summary judgment on damages. (Exhibits 2 and 3 FILED UNDER SEAL) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/2/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 07/09/1999
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/2/99 (by hand)) for summary judgment on Maco's damage claim. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/30/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 07/09/1999
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. re: [58-1] motion for the issuance of an order of assignment pursuant to which a trial judge would be assigned by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/25/99 (EXHIBIT 4 - FILED UNDER SEAL) (JT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Trial deadline set on 9/7/99. See Order of 4/8/99 in 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                    See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT IDENTIFICATION by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 2/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [59-1] motion to Withdraw [58-1] motion to Extend Time within which to serve its expert witness reports and conduct expert depositions by USA, [58-2] motion for Expedited consideration by USA ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/26/99 ) to Withdraw [58-1] motion to Extend Time within which to serve its expert witness reports and conduct expert depositions by USA, [58-2] motion for Expedited consideration by USA. Response due: 2/12/99 (JT) Modified on 01/28/1999
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999, Terminated: 8/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/20/99 ) to Extend Time within which to serve its expert witness reports and conduct expert depositions , (until March 15, 1999) and for Expedited consideration . Response due: 2/8/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                              Witness list by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 1/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority with the Court by USA. Service: 8/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] motion for the issuance of an order of assignment pursuant to which a trial judge would be assigned. Service: 8/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 8/3/98) to [52-1] motion for Leave to reply to any surreply by the United States. Reply due: 8/17/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for Leave to file Counterclaim. Service: 7/27/98 (JT) Modified on 08/05/1998
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 7/28/98 ) to [58-1] motion for the issuance of an order of assignment pursuant to which a trial judge would be assigned. Reply due: 8/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998, Terminated: 8/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/21/98 ) for the issuance of an order of assignment pursuant to which a trial judge would be assigned. Response due: 8/7/98 (JT) Modified on 07/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by MACO BANCORP, INC. to response to [52-1] motion to Strike any surreply to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (or alternatively, plaintiff's motion for leave to file reply thereto). Service: 7/16/98. (HW) Modified on 07/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 7/17/98 ) to [53-1] motion for Leave to file Counterclaim. FILED UNDER SEAL. Reply due: 8/3/98. (HW) Modified on 07/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/10/98 ) to [52-1] motion to Strike any surreply to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [51-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limitation in opposition to Plaintiff's reply in support of short form motion for summary judgment on liability and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Service: 7/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/1/98 ) to [49-1] motion for Sanctions. Reply due: 7/13/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [35-1] cross motion. Service: 7/1/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/30/98) for Leave to file Counterclaim Response due: 7/17/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 6/17/98 ) for Leave to reply to any surreply by the United States Response due: 7/6/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 6/24/98) to Strike any surreply to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment Response due: 7/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 6/24/98) to [51-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limitation in opposition to Plaintiff's reply in support of short form motion for summary judgment on liability and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 7/9/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/16/98 ) for leave to exceed the page limitation in opposition to Plaintiff's reply in support of short form motion for summary judgment on liability and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. (JT) Modified on 06/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 5/15/98 ) for Sanctions. 2 Separate Volumes of Exhibits Response due: 6/1/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 06/02/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 5/15/98 ) to [35-1] cross motion. 2 Separate Volumes of Exhibits Reply due: 6/29/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 06/02/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [47-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 5/15/98 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation of reply in support of short-form motion for partial summary judgment, opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for sanctions. (JT) Modified on 05/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [10-1] motion to substitute parties. Defendant's request for leave to file a motion to dismiss the complaint should be brought before the Managing Judge. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [42-1] notice by USA. Service: 4/23/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response by MACO BANCORP, INC. to defendant's show cause filing and 120-day response to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment by MACO BANCORP, INC. Service: 4/23/98 FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [35-1] cross motion reset to 5/26/98 (per order of 2/24/97, reply is due 44 days after service) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. to [42-1] notice by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of re: ruling on plaintiff's Motion to substitute parties (response to 4/3/98 Order) by USA. Service: 4/14/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part, denying in part [34-1] motion to Compel discovery, denying [34-2] motion for disallowance as a priority case; and directing defendant to file a notice re: plaintiff's motion to substitute parties by 5/4/98 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MACO BANCORP, INC. to [37-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [34-1] motion to Compel discovery . Service: 3/19/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the resolution of the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997 by USA. Service: 3/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to Order to Show Cause. (See Order of December 22, 1997, in Case No. 92-138.) Service: 3/13/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, together with three separate volumes of exhibits, by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 3/9/98 ) to [34-1] motion to Compel discovery, [34-2] motion for disallowance as a priority case. Reply due: 3/23/98 FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 2/20/98 ) and RESPONSE to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment by MACO BANCORP, INC. FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 3/23/98 (JT) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; response to [35-1] cross motion reset to 3/23/98. (JT) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998, Terminated: 4/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/18/98 ) to Compel discovery , and for disallowance as a priority case . Response due: 3/9/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 1/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service : 12/24/97 ) for Summary Judgment. Response due: 2/24/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Alan Levitt Service: 10/7/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joel Jeffreys Roessner. Service : 4/2/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 7/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MACO BANCORP, INC. to response to [29-1] motion to require defendant to file a motion if it seeks to change the case management order, etc. . Service: 12/16/96 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/11/96 ) to [29-1] motion to require defendant to file a motion if it seeks to change the case management order, etc. filed. Reply due: 12/23/96 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION [in form of a letter] by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service BY HAND: 12/4/96) to require defendant to file a motion if it seeks to change the case management order, etc. by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/18/96 (FE) Modified on 12/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Cole. Service: 9/30/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8c for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996, Terminated: 8/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996, Terminated: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Richard Earle Rice (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Richard Earle Rice (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER deferring ruling on plaintiff's motion to substitute parties pending action on the motion to transfer now pending before the district court in FDIC v. Maco Bancorp, Inc., C.A. No. 94-1924 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MACO BANCORP, INC. to response to [10-1] motion to substitute parties. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/15/96) to [10-1] motion to substitute parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File an amended response to plaintiff's motion to substitute parties (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 2/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/15/96 ) for Leave to File an amended response to plaintiff's motion to substitute parties . Response due: 3/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/13/96 By hand) to [10-1] motion to substitute parties. Reply due: 2/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996, Terminated: 4/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC. (Service: 1/30/96) to substitute parties by leave of Judge. Response due: 2/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER mooting [6-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar on appeal in U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation of agreement to moot Defendant's motion to stay following the resolution of motion to transfer. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MACO BANCORP, INC., USA (Service : 10/26/94 ) to Stay . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/7/94) to Stay pending decision in Winstar on appeal in U.S. Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit . Response due: 10/24/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/13/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Earle Rice Service: 10/13/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference and precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held (signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of related cases [No. 94-1923, FDIC v. MACO BANCORP, INC., in the District Court for the District of Columbia: USCFC Nos. 90-773C and 90-8C] by MACO BANCORP, INC. filed. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37637. Answer due on 11/22/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?