ARNOLD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00019-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK R. ARNOLD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Alan Miller +1 202 616 0383 +1 202 307 2503 alan.miller@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/12/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/7/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint with prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Court Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Terminated:
        REPLY by USA to [14-1] order filed by leave of the judge. Service: 3/22/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 3/1/95 for JACK R. ARNOLD. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/6/94) to Dismiss filed by leave of Judge. Response due: 8/8/94 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/7/1994 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its response to plaintiff's complaint reset Answer deadline to 7/6/94 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/30/1994, Terminated: 7/1/1994 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/94 ) to Extend Time within which to file its response to plaintiff's complaint (to July 6, 1994 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/29/94 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/31/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994, Terminated: 6/2/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/31/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to June 29, 1994]. Response due: 7/1/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: 4/21/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file tis response to plaintiff's complaint set Answer deadline to 5/31/94 for USA ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994, Terminated: 4/20/1994 Terminated:
                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 4/15/94 ) to Extend Time within which to file tis response to plaintiff's complaint (to May 30, 1994). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/1994, Entered: 3/16/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 4/15/94 for USA . ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/15/1994, Terminated: 3/15/1994 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/11/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to April 15, 1994). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/1994, Entered: 2/3/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: special procedures. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service : 1/27/94 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994 Court Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994
                                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35850. Answer due on 3/14/94. (AB)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?