GRIMES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00059-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DALLAS GRIMES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck Richard Pardue +1 706 823 2000 +1 706 722 0149 chuckpardue@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund W. Chapman
Office COFC
Filed 1/31/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/28/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [20-1] cross motion and granting [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Terminated:
        REPLY by DALLAS GRIMES to [28-1] response by USA filed by leave of judge. Service: 3/28/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by USA to [27-1] order Service: 3/21/95 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that the defendant provide the Court and plaintiff with a copy of regulations filed in the (Appendix to the Motion for Summary Judgment) and a copy of a Judge Advocate General's advisory opinion signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Terminated:
              CROSS MOTION (AMENDED) by DALLAS GRIMES (Service : 11/8/94) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/9/94 (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Terminated:
                RESPONSE (AMENDED) by DALLAS GRIMES (Service: 11/8/94 ) to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 11/25/94 (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Amend [20-1] cross motion by DALLAS GRIMES. (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by DALLAS GRIMES (Service: 11/8/94) to Amend [20-1] cross motion by DALLAS GRIMES . (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/31/94 ) to [20-1] cross motion Reply due: 11/18/94 (FE) Modified on 11/29/1994
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 10/31/94 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [20-1] cross motion . Service: 10/31/94 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Terminated:
                            CROSS MOTION by DALLAS GRIMES (Service: 10/13/94) and RESPONSE to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 11/14/94. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Statement of Facts
                              STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR CROSS CLAIM filed by DALLAS GRIMES Service: 10/21/94 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Statement of Facts
                                COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by DALLAS GRIMES. Service: 10/13/94 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 11/14/94 . (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/30/1994, Entered: 10/5/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER entered returning "Plaintiff's reply brief to defendant's motion for Summary Judgment and plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment" as UNFILED due to the following defects: 1) not signed by attorney of record; 2: does not comply with provisions of Rule 56.1(b) and 81(d)(1). The plaintiff's corrected submission will be allowed to be filed even if out of time. The time allowed for the defendant to file its response and reply is to gein from the date of service of the corrected response and cross-motion (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994, Terminated: 11/23/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file Cross-motion for summary judgment Response to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 9/28/94 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/28/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994, Terminated: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by DALLAS GRIMES (Service : 7/26/94 ) to Extend Time to file Cross-motion for summary judgment until 9/8/94. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 Administrative Record
                                          Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 7/18/94 [sic.] (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record and to waive copying requiremants ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994, Terminated: 7/18/1994 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/94 ) for Leave to File administrative record and to waive copyingt requiremants Response due: 7/18/94 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Statement of Facts
                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 6/30/94 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/94 ) for Summary Judgment Response due: 8/1/94 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/30/94 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994, Terminated: 6/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until June 30, 1994. Response due: 6/13/94 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/6/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by DALLAS GRIMES (Service: 4/6/94 ) for Leave to File amended complaint . Response due: 4/25/94. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Edmund W. Chapman Service: 4/6/94. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/5/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 5/31/94 for USA . ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/28/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994, Terminated: 3/30/1994 Terminated:
                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 3/28/94) to Extend Time within which to file its response to plaintiffs' complaint (to May 31, 1994). Response due: 4/14/94 (FE) Modified on 04/06/1994
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/15/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Parker McLish. Service : 2/14/94 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/31/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35957. Answer due on 4/1/94. (AB)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?