WILLIAMS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00099-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DARYL M. WILLIAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas David Dinackus +1 202 307 6289 +1 202 514 7969 thomas.dinackus@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/18/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Terminated:
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint with no costs to be assessed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
      ORDER entered dismissing the complaint (signed by Judge James F. Merow) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 Terminated:
        MEMORANDUM by USA re: [15-1] relief reset Brief deadline to 12/5/94, [15-2] order. Service: 12/5/94 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 11/16/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to file supplemental brief and reset Brief deadline to 12/5/94 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994, Terminated: 11/16/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/14/94 ) to Extend Time to file supplemental brief (to December 5, 1994) (FE) Modified on 11/17/1994
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 11/9/1994 Terminated:
              ORDER setting supplemental Brief deadline to 11/14/94 for defendant , and setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/5/94 for plaintiff to respond to supplemental brief. ( signed by James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Terminated:
                Administrative record, consisting of two volumes, filed by USA. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record, granting [8-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/4/94) to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment . Response due: 9/6/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Terminated:
                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 8/4/94 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994, Terminated: 8/8/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/4/94) for Leave to File administrative record and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 8/22/94 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint resetting Answer deadline to 8/4/94 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994, Terminated: 6/30/1994 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/2/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to August 4, 1994]. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/1994, Entered: 4/28/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which it must file its response to plainitff's complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/2/94 for USA (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 04/28/1994
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: 4/26/1994, Terminated: 4/21/1994 Terminated:
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 4/19/94 ) to Extend Time within which to file its response to plainitff's complaint (to June 2, 1994). (FE) Modified on 04/28/1994
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994 Terminated:
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas David Dinackus. Service : 3/3/94. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994 Terminated:
                                      COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #36092. Answer due on 4/19/94. (AB)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?