ROBERSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00118-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY DALE ROBERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Abelson +1 202 616 0461 +1 202 514 7969 steven.abelson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/25/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/22/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion for extension of time for filing response or other appropriate pleading in relation to the Court's order [judgment entered on 3/22/95] (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Terminated:
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint for failure to obey this Court's order and for failure to prosecute (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 3/20/95 for LARRY DALE ROBERSON (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          ORDER Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/15/94 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/22/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/15/94 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Terminated:
              Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 8/16/94. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/15/94 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 9/15/94. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994, Terminated: 8/16/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/12/94) for Leave to File administrative record . Response due: 8/29/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994, Terminated: 8/16/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/8/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until August 15, 1994). Response due: 8/25/94. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/8/94 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/1994, Entered: 6/27/1994, Terminated: 7/18/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to August 8, 1994]. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its response to plaintiff's complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/24/94 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994, Terminated: 5/3/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/94 ) to Extend Time within which to file its response to plaintiff's complaint (to June 24, 1994). (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994 Terminated:
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Jay Abelson Service : 3/9/94 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994 Terminated:
                                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #36143. Answer due on 4/26/94. (AB)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?