KIDD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00221-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES E. KIDD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCormack Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Howard Lynch +1 414 289 9200
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Patrick Murphy +1 202 362 0840
Office COFC
Filed 4/5/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/31/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994 Terminated:
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 8/26/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Terminated:
        REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 8/26/94 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/15/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          RESPONSE by JAMES E. KIDD to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/9/94. Reply due: 8/29/94. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 8/11/94 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 7/14/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994, Terminated: 7/18/1994 Terminated:
              MOTION by JAMES E. KIDD (Service: 7/11/94) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [to August 11, 1994]. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Terminated:
                Administrative record [three volumes] by USA. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record and for waiver of copying requirements (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994, Terminated: 7/11/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/1/94 ) for Leave to File administrative record and for waiver of copying requirements (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994, Terminated: 8/31/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/1/94 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response due: 8/1/94 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/10/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's complaint; resetting Answer deadline to 7/1/94 (signed by Judge James F. Merow) Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/9/1994, Terminated: 6/8/1994 Terminated:
                          UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 6/6/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's complaint (to July 1, 1994). (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994 Terminated:
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Patrick Murphy Service : 4/15/94 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/1994, Entered: 4/6/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                              Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/1994, Entered: 4/6/1994 Terminated:
                                COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #36407. Answer due on 6/6/94. (AB)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?