SMELTZER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00775-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVE R. SMELTZER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond C. McRorie +1 910 864 3737
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Domenique Grace Kirchner +1 202 307 1111 +1 202 514 8624 domenique.kirchner@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/25/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $52000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/29/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint for lack of jurisdiction with no costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER entered granting [4-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). The clerk is directed to entered judgment dismissing the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
        REPLY by DAVE R. SMELTZER to reply to response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/28/94 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 12/16/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by DAVE R. SMELTZER (Service: 12/9/94 ) to [4-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 12/23/94 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 11/30/1994, Terminated: 1/27/1995 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/29/94 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 12/30/94. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Domenique Grace Kirchner Service : 11/2/94 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: 10/27/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: 10/27/1994 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT With Exhibits A through V. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 37836 Answer due on 12/27/94. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 124 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?