LANGDON, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00790-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JEROME D. LANGDON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
No Logo SUE J. LANGDON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Abelson +1 202 616 0461 +1 202 514 7969 steven.abelson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/28/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/26/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 68 awarding plaintiff the sum of $28,727.00, inclusive of interest, costs, and attorney fees (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 Stipulation
        Stipulation by JEROME D. LANGDON, SUE J. LANGDON, USA for entry of judgment (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 5/24/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file JPSR , (until June 23, 1995). Response due: 6/12/95. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file the joint preliminary status report ; setting date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/24/95 , and setting a conditional Joint Status Report deadline to 5/24/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file the joint preliminary status report (to May 24, 1995). Response due: 5/11/95 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 3/10/95 ( JPSR due 4/27/95 ). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/10/95 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995, Terminated: 2/28/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/24/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until March 10, 1995). Response due: 3/13/95. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/24/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995, Terminated: 1/30/1995 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/26/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to February 24, 1995]. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/26/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 1/3/1995, Terminated: 1/3/1995 Terminated:
                            MOTION by JEROME D. LANGDON (Service: 12/27/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to January 26, 1995]. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Jay Abelson Service : 11/2/94 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 37860 Answer due on 12/27/94 (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?