WETSEL-OVIATT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00389-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/14/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $10000000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/16/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (258) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 235 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WETSEL-OVIATT, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 234 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 4/24/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 233 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER staying proceedings pending settlement discussions (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 232 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/8/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for an order pursuant to Rule 56(e) and to respond to discovery requests until 4/10/02. Response due: 3/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 231 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 3/26/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 230 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [228-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for order pursuant to RCFC 56(e) specifying facts that are not in controversy by 3/11/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 229 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Proposed Pretrial Order
                Stipulated pre-trial due dates from WETSEL-OVIATT. Service: 3/4/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 228 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/25/02) to Extend Time to respond to motion for order pursuant to RCFC 56(e) specifying facts that are not in controversy , (until March 11, 2002). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 227 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 20, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 226 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Court Filing
                      ORDER Settlement Status Conference in chambers set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/6/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Status Conference
                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/25/02 ) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 225 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Court Filing
                          ORDER concluding "ADR" proceedings; transferring case back to Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis for trial proceedings; and by 2/15/02 counsel to make arrangements to retrieve confidential materials used in the "ADR" proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Set/Clear Flags
                            **Removed ADR flag. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 224 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002
                                  ADR hearing held (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 223 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 2/6/02) for an order pursuant to RCFC 56(e) specifying facts that are not in controversy . Response due: 2/25/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 222 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER setting Trial for 9:30 a.m. on 6/10/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 221 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                        ORDER referring case to Senior Judge Merow for 60 days for settlement by ADR. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge James F. Merow . (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 1/24/2002 Status Conference
                                            Status Conference held (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 220 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 12/13/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 219 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Status Conference for 3:00pm 12/5/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 11/27/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [216-1] motion For reconsideration of [215-1] order under Rule 83.2 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001, Terminated: 11/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 10/23/01) For reconsideration of [215-1] order under Rule 83.2 . (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Court Filing
                                                        UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [169-1] cross motion, denying [80-1] cross motion, denying [67-1] cross motion, denying [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE of "New Authority" by WETSEL-OVIATT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/25/01. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. 5/16/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER setting telephone Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 5/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 5/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 11:00 a.m. 4/4/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 29, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                      Oral Argument re: [169-1] cross motion by WETSEL-OVIATT ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ), [80-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ), [67-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ), [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II by WETSEL-OVIATT ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ) (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                        Judge's questions for oral argument set for January 29, 2001. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER rescheduling oral argument for 2:00 p.m. on 1/29/01 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [67-1] cross motion, [80-1] cross motion, and [169-1] cross motion . ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 206 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 1/3/01 (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 205 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 1/23/01 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II, [67-1] cross motion, [80-1] cross motion, and [169-1] cross motion . ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard P. Schroeder. Service : 10/12/00 (JT) Modified on 11/08/2000
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER rescheduling oral argument at 10:00 a.m. on 12/14/00 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II, [67-1] cross motion, [80-1] cross motion, and [169-1] cross motion . ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of New Authority by WETSEL-OVIATT. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 201 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Paul Schroeder. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 11/2/00 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II, [67-1] cross motion, [80-1] cross motion, and [169-1] cross motion. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [198-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                            MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 8/15/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY by WETSEL-OVIATT to response to [169-1] cross motion. Service: 8/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [195-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/18/00 for [169-1] cross motion. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 195 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000, Terminated: 6/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 6/27/00) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment until 8/18/00. Response due: 7/14/00. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [193-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/5/00 for [169-1] cross motion (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000, Terminated: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 4/6/00 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to July 5, 2000). Response due: 4/24/00 (DS) Modified on 04/07/2000
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [170-1] statement by WETSEL-OVIATT. Service: 3/20/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 3/20/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 03/24/2000
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/20/00 ) to [169-1] cross motion. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 4/6/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 189 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [188-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000, Terminated: 3/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 03/24/2000
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 187 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [185-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment by 3/20/00 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 186 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000, Terminated: 7/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 1/13/00) to [185-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000, Terminated: 1/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/7/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment [until March 20, 2000]. Response due: 1/24/00 (JT) Modified on 01/10/2000
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [182-1] motion to Extend Time respond to cross-motion. Defendant's response to [169-1] cross motion reset to 1/19/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 11/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 11/16/99 ) to [182-1] motion to Extend Time reply to response to cross-motion. Reply due: 11/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 182 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999, Terminated: 11/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/15/99 ) to Extend Time reply to response to cross-motion [until January 19, 2000]. Response due: 12/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 8/19/99) to [180-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 9/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 8/19/99) for a status conference . Response due: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/17/99 ) to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment [until November 15, 1999]. Response due: 9/3/99 (JT) Modified on 08/18/1999
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [176-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Service: 6/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/1/99) to [177-1] motion for status conference. Reply due: 6/14/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [176-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Defendant's response to [169-1] cross motion reset to 8/17/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 5/20/99 (by hand)) to [176-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 6/3/99 (motion for status conference included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 5/20/99 (by hand)) for status conference. Response due: 6/3/99 (response to motion to extend time included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/17/99 ) to Extend Time to reply and respond to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment [until August 17, 1999]. Response due: 6/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [167-1] motion to Withdraw [161-1] motion to Withdraw [95-1] order, [77-1] order by WETSEL-OVIATT ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [160-1] motion for Leave to file appendix with sequential numbering but with missing numbers ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [163-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for an order withdrawing protective orders ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [164-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to reply to motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability . Response to [169-1] cross motion reset to 5/17/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [164-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to reply to motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability. Service: 12/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998, Terminated: 2/12/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 12/3/98 ) to Withdraw [161-1] motion to Withdraw [95-1] order, [77-1] order by WETSEL-OVIATT. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/21/98 (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [167-1] motion to Withdraw [161-1] motion to Withdraw [95-1] order, [77-1] order by WETSEL-OVIATT reset to 12/21/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 12/4/98 ) to [164-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to reply to motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability. Reply due: 12/18/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 165 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 12/4/98 ) to [164-1] motion to Extend Time to reply and respond to reply to motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability. Reply due: 12/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/25/1998, Terminated: 1/22/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA [Filed by leave of the Judge] (Service : 11/17/98) to Extend Time to reply and respond to reply to motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability until 5/17/99. Response due: 12/4/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 163 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998, Terminated: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for an order withdrawing protective orders , (until May 17, 1999). Response due: 12/4/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 162 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [159-1] motion to Extend Time to submit reply to response to motion for summary judgement for counts I and II of complaint, as well as response to cross-motion for summary judgment on counts I and II and motion for summary judgment on counts III and IV of complaint Response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 10/21/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 10/28/98 ) to Withdraw [95-1] order, [77-1] order . Response due: 8/15/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 1/22/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WETSEL-OVIATT FILED UNDER SEAL [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 10/21/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 1/22/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by WETSEL-OVIATT FILED UNDER SEAL [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 10/21/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 1/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT on the issue of liability for Counts III and IV ( Service by hand: 10/21/98 ) and RESPONSE to [80-1] cross motion, together with three volumes of appendix, FILED UNDER SEAL [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 11/18/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998, Terminated: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service by hand : 10/21/98 ) for Leave to file appendix with sequential numbering but with missing numbers . Response due: 11/04/98. (FE) Modified on 10/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998, Terminated: 10/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 10/19/98 ) to Extend Time to submit reply to response to motion for summary judgement for counts I and II of complaint, as well as response to cross-motion for summary judgement on counts I and II and motion for summary judgement on counts III and IV of complaint , (until October 21, 1998). Response due: 11/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [157-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 9/30/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to the defendants response to motion for summary judgement for counts I and II of complaint, also respond to cross-motion for summary judgement on counts I and II and the motion for summary judgement on counts III and IV of the complaint , (until October 19, 1998). Response due: 10/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 10/12/1998, Terminated: 10/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 9/18/98 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure of Protected Information to Expert Witness Pursuant to Protective Orders by WETSEL-OVIATT. Service: 9/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [153-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 9/30/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 9/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 8/27/98 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until September 30, 1998). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [151-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment Response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 8/28/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998, Terminated: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 5/28/98) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment until 8/28/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [148-1] motion to Extend Time to May 29, 1998, in which to respond to motion for summary judgment Response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 5/29/98, [67-1] cross motion reset to 5/29/98, reply to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II to 5/29/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [143-1] motion for Protective Order, granting [143-2] motion to Quash, granting [143-3] motion for Expedited Consideration ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997, Terminated: 12/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 12/10/97 ) to Extend Time to May 29, 1998, in which to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 12/29/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of "Objection to inspection or copying, etc." by WETSEL-OVIATT, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/26/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 5, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 10/30/97 ) to [143-1] motion for Protective Order, [143-2] motion to Quash Reply due: 11/14/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [143-1] motion for Protective Order, [143-2] motion to Quash, [143-3] motion for Expedited Consideration . Service: 11/4/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/6/1997 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [143-1] motion for Protective Order by USA ( Transcript due 12/5/97 ), [143-2] motion to Quash by USA ( Transcript due 12/5/97 ), [143-3] motion for Expedited Consideration by USA ( Transcript due 12/5/97 ), [142-1] motion for an order requiring production of documents, etc. by WETSEL-OVIATT ( Transcript due 12/5/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: 11/6/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; oral argument set for 11:00 on 11/5/97 for [143-1] motion for Protective Order, [143-2] motion to Quash, [143-3] motion for Expedited Consideration, [142-1] motion for an order requiring production of documents, etc. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997, Terminated: 12/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/28/97 ) for Protective Order , to Quash , and for Expedited Consideration . Response due: 11/14/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 10/20/97 ) for an order requiring production of documents, etc. Response due: 11/6/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 9, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part, denying in part [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions, denying [119-1] motion for Protective Order; and directing defendant to comply with order by 8/1/97 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [137-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment as well as response to cross-mation for summary judgment and motion for summary judgment Response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 12/10/97 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 7/9/97 for [119-1] motion for Protective Order, set for 2:30 7/9/97 for [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997, Terminated: 6/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 6/10/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment as well as response to cross-mation for summary judgment and motion for summary judgment (until 12/10/97). Response due: 6/27/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [135-1] motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Motion for a Protective Order ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997, Terminated: 5/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (REDACTED COPY) (Service : 5/9/97 ) for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Motion for a Protective Order . Response due: 5/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Service : 5/9/97 ) for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Motion for a Protective Order . Response due: 5/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [119-1] motion for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/18/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/17/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for a protective order , [until 4/18/97]. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [128-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for a protective order . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/17/97 for [119-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER re: 2/14/97 motion for enlargement of time within which to reply to motion for summary judgment as to liability for counts I and II, and response to cross-motion for summary judgment on counts I and II. The responses are due June 13, 1997. etc. ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 3/18/97 ) to [128-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for a protective order. Reply due: 3/31/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997, Terminated: 3/27/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/12/97) to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for a protective order [to April 17, 1997]. Response due: 3/31/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [125-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to motion for summary judgment and Response to [80-1] cross motion reset to 6/13/97, [67-1] cross motion reset to 6/13/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [124-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to the reponse to the motion for protective order Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/13/97 for [119-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997, Terminated: 2/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 2/13/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to motion for summary judgment (to June 13, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997, Terminated: 2/19/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/11/97 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to the reponse to the motion for protective order , (until March 13, 1997), by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/3/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 1/28/97) to [119-1] motion for Protective Order filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 2/10/97 (Included with reply re: motion to compel) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by WETSEL-OVIATT to response to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions and opposition to motion for a protective order by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/28/97 (FE) Modified on 02/12/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 1/16/97) to [120-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to compel by leave of the Judge. (FE) Modified on 02/12/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [120-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to compel, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/28/97 for [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions and Response to [119-1] motion for Protective Order reset to 1/28/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997, Terminated: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 1/21/97) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to compel [to January 28, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service BY HAND: 1/10/97) for Protective Order . Response due: 1/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service BY HAND: 1/10/97) to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions. Reply due: 1/22/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [117-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests and Response to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions reset to 1/10/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997, Terminated: 1/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/10/97) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to January 10, 1997]. Response due: 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [114-1] motion to Extend Time within which respond to motion to compel discovery and Response to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions reset to 1/9/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 12/4/96) to [114-1] motion to Extend Time within which respond to motion to compel discovery. Reply due: 12/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996, Terminated: 12/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/2/96 ) to Extend Time within which respond to motion to compel discovery , (until 1/9/97). Response due: 12/19/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [112-1] motion to Extend Time within which reply to motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/13/97 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996, Terminated: 11/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 11/15/96 ) to Extend Time within which reply to motion for summary judgment , (until 2/13/96). Response due: 12/2/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [109-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions and Response to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and to deposition questions reset to 11/29/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 10/17/96 ) to [109-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions. Reply due: 10/31/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/15/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions [to December 20, 1996]. Response due: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [107-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel documents, etc. and Response to [106-1] motion to Compel production of documents and to deposition questions reset to 10/11/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996, Terminated: 9/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/22/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel documents, etc. , (until October 11, 1996). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996, Terminated: 7/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service by hand: 8/8/96 ) to Compel production of documents and answers to deposition questions , [filed IN CAMERA]. Response due: 8/22/96. (HW) Modified on 08/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [104-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file reply brief and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/15/96 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996, Terminated: 7/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 7/18/96 ) to Extend Time within which to file reply brief , (until November 15, 1996). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Lance Jay Lerman (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [98-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents reset Response to Request for Production of Documents deadline to 5/8/96 , and reset Interrogatories deadline to 5/8/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [100-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment as to liability for Counts I and II and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/19/96 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996, Terminated: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 4/23/96) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment as to liability for Counts I and II [to July 19, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [97-1] motion for Leave to File motion for enlargement to reply to response to motion for summary judgment re: Counts I and II (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 4/26/96) to Extend Time to respond to First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents until 5/8/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996, Terminated: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 4/23/96) for Leave to File motion for enlargement to reply to response to motion for summary judgment re: Counts I and II . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [94-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to first set of interrogatories and request for production of documents and reset Interrogatories deadline to 4/26/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996, Terminated: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 3/25/96) to Extend Time to respond to first set of interrogatories and request for production of documents until 4/26/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATTand USA for Protective Order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Alan I. Saltman (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [87-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment re: liability on Counts I and II Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/1/96 for [80-1] cross motion . (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 17, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [47-1] motion to Dismiss resetting Answer deadline to 11/3/95 . Costs to plaintiff. (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT to [86-1] memorandum by USA [filed by leave of the Judge]. Service: 10/5/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995, Terminated: 10/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 10/20/95) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment re: liability on Counts I and II [to April 1, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [47-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. (Transcript due 11/16/95) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by USA re: supplementation to [47-1] motion to Dismiss by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 9/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to File its motion to exceed the page limitation, out of time, granting [68-2] motion for Leave to File an original declaration, granting [68-3] motion for Leave to File defendant's statement of genuine issues, out of time ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [81-1] motion to Stay proceedings on motion to compel Defendant to respond to discovery ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 9/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 8/25/95) to Stay proceedings on motion to compel Defendant to respond to discovery . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [82-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II reset to 10/20/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995, Terminated: 8/23/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 8/21/95 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until October 20, 1995). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel and Response to [63-1] motion to Compel Defendant to respond to discovery reset to 8/25/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT and USA for Protective Order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995, Terminated: 8/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/11/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel , (until August 25, 1995). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED COPY OF CROSS MOTION by USA and RESPONSE to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II by WETSEL-OVIATT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [71-1] motion for Leave to File corrected copies of its brief (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel Response to [63-1] motion to Compel Defendant to respond to discovery reset to 8/11/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995, Terminated: 8/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/31/95) for Leave to File corrected copies of its brief . Response due: 8/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/28/1995, Terminated: 8/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/27/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel (to August 11, 1995). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered denying [62-1] motion to shorten time for Defendant's response to motion to compel ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 7/18/95 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORIGINAL DECLARATION of John E. Phipps in support of [67-1] cross motion by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995, Terminated: 9/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/17/95 ) for Leave to File its motion to exceed the page limitation, out of time ; for Leave to File an original declaration ; and for Leave to File defendant's statement of genuine issues, out of time filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 8/4/95 (FE) Modified on 08/01/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 7/17/95) and RESPONSE to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II by WETSEL-OVIATT filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 8/17/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered granting [65-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation by 22 pages ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995, Terminated: 7/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service: 7/17/95) For leave to exceed the page limitation by 22 pages filed by leave of the judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/17/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [67-1] cross motion reset to 8/17/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service BY HAND: 7/14/95) to Compel Defendant to respond to discovery . Response due: 7/28/95 (FE) Modified on 07/27/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995, Terminated: 7/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service BY HAND: 7/14/95) to shorten time for Defendant's response to motion to compel . Response due: 7/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [47-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 7/6/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by WETSEL-OVIATT Re: [56-1] order [original Declaration of Cecil L. Westel, Jr.] Service 6/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [53-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II reset to 7/17/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 6/19/95 ) for oral Hearing Response due: 7/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 6/19/95 ) to [47-1] motion to Dismiss Reply due: 7/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered granting [55-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER entered granting [54-1] motion for Leave to File a facsimile copy ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 6/16/95 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. [by ten pages] filed by leave of the judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/20/95) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment until 7/17/95. Response due: 7/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 6/19/95 ) for Leave to File a facsimile copy Response due: 7/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 6/15/95 ) for Leave for a status conference . Response due: 7/3/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 6/6/95 ) to [50-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment on counts I and II Reply due: 6/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/5/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment on counts I and II [to June 22, 1995]. Response due: 6/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 3, 1995 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set defendant's supplemental response to first set of Interrogatories deadline to 6/23/95 , and set defendant's response to second set of Interrogatories deadline to 5/26/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995, Terminated: 10/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/19/95 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 6/19/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of proposed discovery schedule by WETSEL-OVIATT. Service: 5/12/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [34-1] motion to Dismiss, vacating [44-1] order, set Defendant's second Motion to dismiss Filing deadline to 5/19/95 , Defendant's Response to [8-1] motion for Summary on the issue of liability for Counts I and II reset to 6/5/95 and Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/19/95 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/9/1995 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral Argument held re: [34-1] motion to Dismiss by USA (Transcript due 6/2/95). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Stay discovery pending resolution of motion to dismiss (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [34-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 4/6/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/6/95 for [34-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 3/24/95 ) to [38-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss Reply due: 4/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [35-1] motion to Stay discovery. Service: 3/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 3/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995, Terminated: 3/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/21/95 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss (to April 6, 1995). Response due: 4/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 3/9/95 ) to [35-1] motion to Stay discovery. Reply due: 3/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service BY HAND: 3/7/95) for oral Hearing . Response due: 3/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service BY HAND: 3/7/95) to [34-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 3/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995, Terminated: 4/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/23/95) to Stay discovery . Response due: 3/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/13/95 ) to Dismiss IN CAMERA (under seal). Response due: 3/16/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss and attached appendix IN CAMERA (under seal) ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995, Terminated: 2/16/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/95 ) for Leave to File motion to dismiss and attached appendix IN CAMERA (under seal) filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/2/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to Counts I and II of plaintiff's complaint and to submit its responses to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II reset to 2/21/95 , and reset Interrogatories deadline to 2/21/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/30/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/23/95) to Extend Time to file a joint preliminary status report [to January 30, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to Counts I and II of plaintiff's complaint and to submit its responses to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents (to February 21, 1995). 8/15/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by WETSEL-OVIATT, USA (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [25-1] joint motion to Extend Time in which to submit the Joint Preliminary Status Report reset Status Report deadline to 1/23/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 1/23/95 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 1/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT, USA to Extend Time in which to submit the Joint Preliminary Status Report (to January 23, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/23/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests set response brief deadline to 12/30/94 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 12/21/94) to [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 12/21/94) to [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests. Reply due: 1/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/19/94) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [to January 19, 1995]. Response due: 1/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994, Terminated: 12/23/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/19/94) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to January 19, 1995]. Response due: 1/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/6/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/30/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for production of documents . (to December 30, 1994) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/19/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment on the issues of liability of Counts I and II Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II to 12/19/94 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint, granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. NOTE: ANSWER WAS FILED ON 11/17/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 11/18/94 (JPSR due 1/5/95) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/17/1994, Entered: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 11/17/94) to [87-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment re: liability on Counts I and II. Reply due: 12/2/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/15/1994, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 11/21/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 11/15/94) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment on the issues of liability of Counts I and II [to December 19, 1994]. Response due: 12/2/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 11/4/94 ) to [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint Reply due: 11/14/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/15/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of interrogatories, set Interrogatories deadline to 11/30/94 and set Request for Production of Documents deadline to 11/30/94 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994, Terminated: 11/21/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/2/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until November 21, 1994). Response due: 11/21/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994, Terminated: 11/3/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/31/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of interrogatories , (until November 30, 1994). Response due: 11/17/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/27/1994 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WETSEL-OVIATT Service BY HAND: 10/20/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service BY HAND: 10/20/94) for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability for Counts I and II . Response due: 11/18/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT to [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint Service: 10/4/94 Reply due: 10/21/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/3/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/3/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until November 2, 1994). Response due: 10/20/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/3/94 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994, Terminated: 8/24/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/15/94 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until October 3, 1994). Response due: 9/1/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 6/30/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman Service: 6/30/94. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #36908. Answer due on 8/15/94. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?