MILLER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00428-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WOODROW MILLER, JR., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Lane Tucker +1 202 514 7300
Office COFC
Filed 7/5/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/18/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 05/22/1995
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION entered dismissing the [1-1] complaint, and directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 05/22/1995
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
        MOTION by WOODROW MILLER JR. (Service : 3/2/95 ) for Summary Judgment filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/3/95. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
          PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS by WOODROW MILLER JR. filed by leave of the judge. Service: 3/2/95 (FE) Modified on 03/15/1995
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Terminated:
            MOTION by WOODROW MILLER JR. (Service : 3/2/95 ) for Summary Judgment filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 4/3/95 (FE) Modified on 03/15/1995
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Terminated:
              MOTION by WOODROW MILLER JR. (Service : 3/2/95 ) for Leave to File untimely motion for summary judgment filed by leave of the judge. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due to untimeliness and noncompliance with rules (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/4/94 ) for Summary Judgment Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/5/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/4/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Administrative Record
                      Administrative record [three volumes] filed by USA. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994, Terminated: 11/10/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/4/94 ) for Waiver of Duplication Response due: 11/21/94 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER entered re: defendant's request for enlargement of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/21/94) to Extend Time to file the record and motion for summary judgment [to November 4, 1994]. Response due: 11/7/94 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/9/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/21/94 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by S. Lane Tucker Service: 8/5/94 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994, Terminated: 8/9/1994 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/5/94) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to October 21, 1994]. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 7/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER directing Defendant to file the record of proceedings before the Court of Military Appeals and the Army Court of Military Review no later than August 1, 1994 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994 Terminated:
                                          COMPLAINT. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #37064. Answer due on 9/6/94. (AB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (AB)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?