THUMSER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-01064-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD S. THUMSER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jan Marie Folena
Office COFC
Filed 12/12/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/28/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 92 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 91 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [82-1] cross motion, denying [76-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, and directing the clerk to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. No costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 90 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by RICHARD S. THUMSER to response to [76-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record . Service: 6/6/02. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 89 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [88-1] motion for Leave to file a reply to the renewed motion for judgment on the administrative record (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 88 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 6/13/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 6/6/02) for Leave to file a reply to the renewed motion for judgment on the administrative record . Response due: 6/24/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 87 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Response to [82-1] cross motion due 5/15/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 86 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [85-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to opposition to motion for judgment on the administrative record and cross-motion for judgment on the administrative record Response to [82-1] cross motion reset to 5/7/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 85 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002, Terminated: 4/18/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                  MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 4/15/02) to Extend Time to respond to opposition to motion for judgment on the administrative record and cross-motion for judgment on the administrative record , (until May 7, 2002). (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 84 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and to respond to Defendant's cross-motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record Response to [82-1] cross motion due 4/16/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 83 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 3/21/02) to Extend Time to reply to the Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and to respond to Defendant's cross-motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record until 4/16/02. Response due: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 82 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 8/27/2002 Cross MotionCourt Filing
                        CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/02) and RESPONSE to [76-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/25/02. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 81 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Court Filing
                          COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/21/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 80 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Court Filing
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/21/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002
                              Deadline updated; Response to [82-1] cross motion due 3/25/02 . (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 79 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [78-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the renewed Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record Response to [76-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record reset to 2/21/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 78 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002, Terminated: 1/18/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/16/02) to Extend Time to respond to the renewed Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record until 2/21/02. Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 77 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Statement of Facts
                                    RENEWED STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Service: 12/21/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 76 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                      RENEWED MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 12/21/01) for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record . Response due: 1/21/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 75 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit a renewed motion for summary judgment and brief. reset Motion Filing deadline to 12/21/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 74 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001, Terminated: 12/13/2001 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 12/6/01 ) to Extend Time within which to submit a renewed motion for summary judgment and brief , (until December 21, 2001). Response due: 12/24/01 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 73 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Extend Time to submit renewed motion for summary judgment Motion Filing deadline to 12/11/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 72 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001, Terminated: 11/7/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 10/31/01 ) to Extend Time to submit renewed motion for summary judgment until 12/11/01. (AB)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 71 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time to file a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and brief Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Filing deadline to 11/5/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 9/13/01) to Extend Time to file a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and brief until 11/5/01. Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to file the Motion for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment is due on 9/17/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 8/16/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 8/10/01) to Extend Time to file the Motion for Summary Judgment until 9/17/01. Response due: 8/27/01. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Administrative Record
                                                        Supplemental Administrative record filed by USA. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [65-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental administrative record Motion for Summary Judgment due on 8/17/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001, Terminated: 6/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/26/01) for Leave to file supplemental administrative record . Response due: 7/13/01. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [22-1] cross motion, denying [12-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Records (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 5/14/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE of agency action by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Service: 3/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/2/99. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [58-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings to permit the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records to complete a pending reconsideration of its decision based upon new material evidence; and directing plaintiff to notify the court promptly upon the Board's decision. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/16/98 ) to [58-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings to permit the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records to complete a pending reconsideration of its decision based upon new material evidence filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/4/99 (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 1/27/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 12/7/98 ) to continue stay of proceedings to permit the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records to complete a pending reconsideration of its decision based upon new material evidence. Response due: 12/28/98 (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jan Marie Folena. Service : 11/18/98 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Stay proceedings or, in the alternative, unopposed motion for enlargement of time. All proceedings are stayed until a decision upon the merits has been reached in Small v. United States. Defendant is directed to file a status report promptly upon a decision. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998, Terminated: 3/6/1998 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/2/98 ) to Stay proceedings or, in the alternative, unopposed motion for enlargement of time [until a decision upon the merits has been reached in Small v. United States]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 12/30/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Answer due 2/27/98 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 12/29/97 (CDC) Modified on 03/03/1998
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 12/11/1997 Administrative Record
                                                                                    Supplement to Administrative record filed by USA Service: 12/10/97 (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER lifting suspension; directing defendant to file a supplement to the administrative record by 12/10/97 , plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 12/31/97 , and defendant to file its answer within 60 days of service of amended complaint. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [49-1] notice by RICHARD S. THUMSER, [48-1] report by RICHARD S. THUMSER Service: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER directing defendant to respond to plaintiff's October 1, 1997 notice and status report by 10/27/97 . ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE pursuant to Rule 60.1(b)(4) filed by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Service: 9/30/97 (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/2/1997 Status Report
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER Service: 9/30/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER set Status Report deadline to 10/1/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER and USA. Service: (AB)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Extending Time within which to file joint status report until 6/11/97. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Status Report deadline to 6/11/97 (AB)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/28/97 ) to Extend Time within which to file joint status report , (until June 11, 1997). Response due: 6/16/97. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/28/97. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint status report reset Status Report deadline to 5/22/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997, Terminated: 5/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/12/97) to Extend Time to file joint status report (to May 22, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997, Terminated: 5/15/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/12/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/12/97 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Service: 3/6/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER. Service: 12/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Leave to File a status report and set Status Report deadline to 3/7/97 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996, Terminated: 12/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 12/3/96) for Leave to File a status report . (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/18/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/18/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 12/3/96 and filing a status report by leave of the Judge (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Alfred Sherwood Irving Jr. Service : 7/18/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Jennifer Hong (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by RICHARD S. THUMSER by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 8/30/96 and filing a status report by leave of the Judge (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [29-1] joint motion to Stay to allow Air Force Board of Correction of Military Records to reopen administrative proceedings and set Plaintiff's Status Report deadline to 5/9/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Stay to allow Air Force Board of Correction of Military Records to reopen administrative proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY by RICHARD S. THUMSER to response to [21-1] motion for Leave to File supplement to the record. Service: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion to supplement and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/24/95 for [21-1] motion for Leave to File supplement to the record (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/18/1995, Terminated: 10/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 10/12/95) to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion to supplement until 10/24/95. Response due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Staying Defendant's response to cross motion for summary judgment and to file a reply pending further order of Court (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/5/95) to [21-1] motion for Leave to File supplement to the record filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/20/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by RICHARD S. THUMSER filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995, Terminated: 5/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service: 9/18/95) and RESPONSE to [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Records by USA filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/13/95 (FE) Modified on 10/16/1995
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 9/18/95 ) for Leave to File supplement to the record filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered directing the filing of plaintiff's: motion to supplement; cross-motion for summary judgmnet; and counter-statement of facts. (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 9/15/95) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment until 9/19/95. (FE) Modified on 09/28/1995
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to motion to dismiss, etc.; Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 9/18/95 and [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Records reset to 9/18/95 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995, Terminated: 9/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 9/5/95 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to motion to dismiss, etc. , (until September 18, 1995). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 9/11/95, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Records reset to 9/11/95 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995, Terminated: 7/24/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by RICHARD S. THUMSER (Service : 7/7/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment (to September 11, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995
                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative record filed by USA [two volumes] Service:?? (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File Administrative Record ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995, Terminated: 5/11/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/12/95 ) to Dismiss , or, in the alternative for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Records filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 7/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA filed by leave of the judge. Service: 6/12/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995, Terminated: 6/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/12/95 ) for Leave to File Administrative Record Response due: 6/29/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Answer deadline to 6/12/95 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/9/1995, Terminated: 5/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/4/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to June 12, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer to 5/11/95 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995, Terminated: 3/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (May 11, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/27/95 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995, Terminated: 2/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/26/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to March 27, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jennifer Hong Service : 1/3/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 PAID. RECEIPT # 38915. Answer due on 2/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?