MONINO v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-vv-00005-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JAIME MONINO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Ferebee Gossee Elmendorf +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 1/4/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/8/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $13,556.29 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 1/4/1996 notice of filing
    Notice of filing Change of Address for petitioner's attorney by JAIME MONINO. Service: 12/20/95. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 Petitioner's Election
      PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 12/20/95 Election(y/n): y (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
        Certified copy of [election and] judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Judgment*
          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding attorneys' fees and costs in the sum of $13,556.29, with payment to be made by check made payable jointly to Mr. Monino and to Mr. Homer (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Terminated:
            MOTION by JAIME MONINO (Service: 11/30/95) for Attorney Fees . Response due: 12/18/95 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Notice Not to Seek Review
              JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Caroline Ferebee Gossee Elmendorf. Service : 12/6/95 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 DECISION of Special Master
                  Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition without prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Terminated Case
                      Case closed. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 DECISION of Special Master
                        Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995 Terminated:
                          MOTION by JAIME MONINO (Service: 9/26/95) to Dismiss . Response due: 10/13/95 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Order
                            ORDER to Show Cause , and Response to Show Cause due: 9/27/95 for JAIME MONINO ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Order
                              ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 8/4/95 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by JAIME MONINO. Service: 6/30/95 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 8/9/95 [30 days]. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Order
                                    ORDER entered directing Additional Documents [a report informing the special master about the status of this case] due: 6/30/95 for JAIME MONINO ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by JAIME MONINO (Service: 6/5/95) to Compel Connaught Laboratories to fully respond to 1/31/95 order . Response due: 6/22/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by JAIME MONINO. Service: 6/5/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Deadline updated; set Petitioner's Status Report deadline to 7/10/95 . (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by JAIME MONINO. Service: 5/12/95. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 6/19/95 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995 Order
                                                ORDER set Status Report deadline to 5/5/95 , and every 30 days thereafter ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Order
                                                  ORDER entered granting [13-2] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas for information from CONNAUGHT ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 notice of filing
                                                    Notice of filing petitioner's election to remain in the program by JAIME MONINO. Service: 1/19/95. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Order
                                                      ORDER set Additional Documents [notice of intent] due: 2/9/95 for JAIME MONINO (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 01/12/1995
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994 Order
                                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 1/30/95 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 notice of filing
                                                          Notice of filing Exhibit 11, letter of Marcel Kinsbourne, M.D. by JAIME MONINO. Service: 11/7/94 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 10/5/1994 Order
                                                            ORDER entered directing the petitioner to file supplement to the record with letter from Marcel Kinsborne, M.D., etc. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 9/20/1994, Entered: 9/23/1994 Order
                                                              ORDER reset Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 9/30/94 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Order
                                                                ORDER Staying Special Master's decision for 180 days (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994 Order
                                                                  ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/22/94 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/18/1994, Entered: 8/23/1994 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by JAIME MONINO (Service : 8/15/94 ) to Extend Time to file medical report [60 days] and for authorization of service of subpoenas for information from CONNAUGHT . Response due: 9/1/94 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/7/1994, Entered: 7/13/1994 Order
                                                                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to comply with the May 24, 1994 order reset Expert Report and amended petition due: 8/15/94 for JAIME MONINO (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994, Terminated: 7/7/1994 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by JAIME MONINO (Service : 7/1/94 ) to Extend Time to comply with the May 24, 1994 order for 45 days. Response due: 7/18/94 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994 Scheduling Order
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Medical Expert Report and amended petition due: 7/1/94 for JAIME MONINO; The parties have 30 days after service of medical expert's opinion to discuss deficiencies and settlement; At the end of the 30-day period, the parties shall file a joint status report ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Order
                                                                            ORDER entered scheduling a Rule 5 conference for May 20, 1994 at 11:00 a.m. (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/18/1994, Entered: 4/22/1994 Respondent's Report
                                                                              RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 4/18/94 (FE) Modified on 05/26/1994
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/22/1994 Order
                                                                                ORDER mooting [4-1] motion to Extend Time in which to file her Vaccine Rule 4(b) report (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 05/26/1994
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 4/12/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                  See 90-1082V for NOTICE OF reassignment to Special Master John F. Edwards . Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 04/13/1994
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/6/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Alfonso Jacobo Montano Service : 4/6/94 (FE) Modified on 04/13/1994
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by HHS (Service: 4/12/94) to Extend Time in which to file her Vaccine Rule 4(b) report (to April 11, 1994). (FE) Modified on 04/13/1994
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/1994, Entered: 3/22/1994 Remark
                                                                                        See Case No. 90-551V for notice advising the parties of the resignation of the Special Master, effective April 2, 1994. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/5/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to Special Master Paul Baird . Copy to parties. (AB)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/5/1994 Petition
                                                                                            PETITION by JAIME MONINO. FILING FEE OF $120 PAID. RECEIPT #35789. ( Respondent's report due 4/4/94 ) (AB)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Vaccination Date
                                                                                              Vac. Date: 1/6/91 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/6/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (AB)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?