GARRETT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00939-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SHARNETT Y. GARRETT, Plaintiff

Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas David Dinackus +1 202 307 6289 +1 202 514 7969 thomas.dinackus@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/31/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 306 - Civilian Pay - Overtime Compensation
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/31/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
191-cv-01334-MBH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41(a), dismissing the case without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs, attorney's fees and expenses. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), filed by SHARNETT Y. GARRETT. Service: 7/23/2007.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
        STIPULATION of Dismissal, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) filed by SHARNETT Y. GARRETT. Service: 10/25/2006.(hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas David Dinackus Service : 12/2/94 (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            SEE 94-792C for Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Complaint
              COMPLAINT Answer due on 12/30/94. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Set/Clear Flags
                Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 91-1334. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 362 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?