CHAMPAGNE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00983-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey John Wood +1 717 541 9979 +1 717 541 9495
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Owen Mason +1 703 760 5200 +1 703 748 0244 tmason@williamsmullen.com
Office COFC
Filed 11/3/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/18/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC July 18, 2001 NUNC PRO TUNC April 10, 1998 affirmed [26-1] judgment order. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [27-1] appeal by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5090 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE. Copy to USA, Judge Horn and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 041340. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED DECISION denying [14-1] cross motion, granting [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (one volume) taken at Washington, D.C., on July 12, 1995 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Owen Mason Service : 7/21/95 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File additional material to the Administrative Record (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995, Terminated: 7/19/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE (Service : 7/13/95 ) for Leave to File additional material to the Administrative Record . Response due: 7/31/95. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Oral Argument
                      Oral Argument held re: [14-1] cross motion by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE (Transcript due 8/11/95) (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 7/12/95 for [14-1] cross motion and set for 10:00 a.m. on 7/12/95 for [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of change of address by Jeffrey James Wood (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE to response to [14-1] cross motion. Service: 4/11/95 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/12/1995 Statement of Facts
                              COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA filed by leave of the judge. Service: 4/3/95 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER entred that defendant's counter-statement of facts with a reply brief is filed by leave of the court (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by USA to response to [14-1] cross motion. Service: 4/3/95 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Terminated:
                                    CROSS MOTION by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE ( Service: 2/20/95 ) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 3/23/95 (FE) Modified on 03/10/1995
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Proposed Additional Facts
                                      PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS filed by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE. Service: 2/20/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Statement of Facts
                                        COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE. Service: 2/20/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Statement of Facts
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by ARNOLD CHAMPAGNE. Service: 3/7/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Deadline updated; Response to [14-1] cross motion and reply to motion for summary judgment set to 3/23/95 . (FE) Modified on 03/10/1995
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER entered re: the returning UNFILED of plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment for the following defects: (1) Pursuant to Rule 5(e) of the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims, proof of service must be attached; (2) Pursuant to Rule 56.1(b)(1), the cross-moving party shall file with its motion for summary judgment, Statement of Facts . Plaintiif's are directed to correct defects and refile by March 10, 1995 set Brief deadline to 3/10/95 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 Administrative Record
                                                Administrative record filed by USA. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995, Terminated: 2/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/95 ) for Leave to File administrative record Response due: 2/21/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Statement of Facts
                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 2/2/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/95 ) for Summary Judgment filed together with a one volume appendix. Response due: 3/6/95 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/3/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995, Terminated: 1/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/3/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until February 2, 1995). Response due: 1/20/95. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Patrick Murphy Service : 11/14/94 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 37924 Answer due on 1/3/95 (FE)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?