HAINES ASSOCIATES, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-00995-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Haines and Associates, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "HAINES ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary E. Suoja +1 206 453 9200
No Logo MARTY D. FRANTZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary E. Suoja +1 206 453 9200
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Domenique Grace Kirchner +1 202 307 1111 +1 202 514 8624 domenique.kirchner@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/8/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $85000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/21/1996
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 94-579[W. District of Washington]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Record Transferred Out
All original papers comprising the record together with certified copies of docket entries, Order, and Judgment forwarded to U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
        UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho and directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho. (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
          JOINT MOTION by HAINES ASSOCIATES, MARTY D. FRANTZ, and the USA (Service: 5/13/96) to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho . (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which the parties' may file the joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/22/95 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/9/1995, Terminated: 5/16/1995 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/5/95) to Extend Time within which the parties' may file the joint preliminary status report (to May 22, 1995). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file JPSR and resetting date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/8/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn) Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/21/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/21/95) to Extend Time to file JPSR (to May 8, 1995). (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER returning Plaintiff's amended complaint for payment of funds for correction of defects [failure to comply with Rule 83 and fails to comply with G.O. 32] (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 3/8/95. (JPSR due 4/25/95). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Domenique Grace Kirchner. Service: 3/7/95 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Nuriye Uygur Service : 1/30/95 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
                              **Not member of bar flag removed. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn . Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 3/10/95. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                    Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington at Seattle, case number C94-579, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 12/6/94). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Set/Clear Flags
                                      **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?