HODGES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-cv-01018-TJL
District Judge Thomas J. Lydon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES J. HODGES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond C. McRorie +1 910 864 3737
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Hong +1 202 514 4325
Office COFC
Filed 11/21/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $39000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/5/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint with no costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and granting [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 17, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Oral Argument
          Oral Argument re: [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA. ( Transcript due 11/16/95 ) (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER oral argument reset for 10:00 a.m. on 10/17/95 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 10/11/95 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, set for 10:00 10/11/95 for [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of reassignment to Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon . Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/5/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record. Service: 6/1/95 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by JAMES J. HODGES (Service: 5/5/95 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record filed by leave of the judge. Reply due: 6/2/95 per order of 5/15/95. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered allowing plaintiff response filed by leave of the court; directing defendant, at its option, to file a Reply to Response to Motion by 6/2/95 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record of not more than six pages (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record . Service: 4/24/95 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                          RESPONSE by JAMES J. HODGES (Service: 4/12/95 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [13-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/1/95 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of change of address by Raymond C. McRorie. Service: 4/6/95 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/20/95) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Judgment upon the administrative record (by leave of the judge) Response due: 4/20/95 (DS) Modified on 03/24/1995
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Statement of Facts
                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA (by leave of the judge). Service: 3/20/95 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Administrative Record
                                  Administrative record (2 volumes) filed by USA. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record and for waiver of copying requirements (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995, Terminated: 3/17/1995 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/95 ) for Leave to File the administrative record and for waiver of copying requirements . (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint, granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/21/95 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/16/1995, Terminated: 2/13/1995 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/10/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until March 21, 1995). Response due: 2/27/95 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jennifer Hong Service: 2/8/95 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/20/95 ) to Extend Time to file response to complaint (to February 20, 1995). Response due: 2/6/95 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeffrey Jay Bernstein. Service : 12/?/94 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT with Exhibits A,B (1-24),C. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #38045, Answer due on 1/20/95. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?