FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00407-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALVIN GORMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo BRUCE J. FREY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo CHARLES BARANCIK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo David, Hermelin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Flagship Federal Savings Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo MARTIN GOLDMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo MICKEY SHAPIRO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo MILTON H. DRESNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo RICHARD BARANCIK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo ROBERT SOSNICK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Scott Lawlor
Office COFC
Filed 6/19/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/19/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, BRUCE J. FREY, MILTON H. DRESNER, CHARLES BARANCIK, RICHARD BARANCIK, ALVIN GORMAN, MICKEY SHAPIRO, ROBERT SOSNICK, DAVID HERMELIN, MARTIN GOLDMAN, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to file responses, including objections, to first set of interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 2/7/00 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Scott Lawlor. Service : 2/1/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Terminated:
          MOTION by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, BRUCE J. FREY, MILTON H. DRESNER, CHARLES BARANCIK, RICHARD BARANCIK, ALVIN GORMAN, MICKEY SHAPIRO, ROBERT SOSNICK, DAVID HERMELIN and MARTIN GOLDMAN (Service: 1/24/00) to Extend Time to file responses, including objections, to first set of interrogatories , (until February 7, 2000). (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: special procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 10/18/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's request for production of documents until October 18, 1999. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999, Terminated: 10/18/1999 Terminated:
                MOTION by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL (Service : 10/4/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's request for production of documents [until October 18, 1999]. Response due: 10/21/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/99 ) for partial dismissal. Response due: 10/25/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to rescind opt-out notice. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999, Terminated: 5/7/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, BRUCE J. FREY, MILTON H. DRESNER, CHARLES BARANCIK, RICHARD BARANCIK, ALVIN GORMAN, MICKEY SHAPIRO, ROBERT SOSNICK, DAVID HERMELIN, MARTIN GOLDMAN (Service : 5/4/99 ) for Leave to to recind opt-out notice . Response due: 5/21/99 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Opt-Out of the Second 30 round of case-specific discovery by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, BRUCE J. FREY, MILTON H. DRESNER, CHARLES BARANCIK, RICHARD BARANCIK, ALVIN GORMAN, MICKEY SHAPIRO, ROBERT SOSNICK, DAVID HERMELIN, MARTIN GOLDMAN. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melissa Barbara Rogers. Service : 7/27/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Pamela Anne Roth Service : 12/6/96 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                  NOTICE of change of address by Shalom Brilliant (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/29/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/16/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Stay proceedings until final determination of Winstar 90-8C. Parties are directed to file a status report(s) within 20 days afetr the expiration of the stay ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995, Terminated: 9/25/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/18/95) to Stay proceedings until final determination of Winstar 90-8C . Response due: 10/5/95 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's complaint reset Answer deadline to 9/18/95 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995, Terminated: 7/25/1995 Terminated:
                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 7/21/95 ) to Extend Time within whichv to respond to plaintiff's complaint (to September 18, 1995). (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Shalom Brilliant Service : 7/21/95 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE of related cases (90-8 C etc., Windstar Corp., et al.) by FLAGSHIP FEDERAL, BRUCE J. FREY, MILTON H. DRESNER, CHARLES BARANCIK, RICHARD BARANCIK, ALVIN GORMAN, MICKEY SHAPIRO, ROBERT SOSNICK, DAVID HERMELIN and MARTIN GOLDMAN, (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39488. Answer due on 8/18/95. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?